Kilbourne v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Richard Brent Kilbourne
Defendant: Heidi E. Washington, Kim Cargor, Norder, Brassfield and Madrey
Case Number: 4:2023cv13008
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: F Kay Behm
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (KMac)
January 25, 2024 Attorney Austin C. Raines is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: Limited Appearance of Counsel was entered for purposes of participating in Early Mediation Only. (Raines, Austin)
January 24, 2024 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for Brassfield, Kim Cargor, Norder, Heidi E. Washington. Documents mailed by USMS on 1/24/2024. (NAhm)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #9 MOTION to Exclude Case from the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program filed by Richard Brent Kilbourne, ORDER LIFTING STAY, AND ORDER directing service without prepayment of costs and authorizing the US Marshal to collect costs after service is made - Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (CCie)
January 18, 2024 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Order Lifting Stay,, Directing Service by the US Marshal, on Richard Brent Kilbourne Pris No. 190446, at G. ROBERT COTTON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 3500 N. ELM ROAD, JACKSON MI 49201 (CCie)
January 16, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Exclude Case from the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program by Richard Brent Kilbourne. (DPer)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (RLou)
January 16, 2024 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Order Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference on Richard Brent Kilbourne, Pris No. 190446, at G. ROBERT COTTON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 3500 N. ELM ROAD, JACKSON MI 49201 (RLou)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Austin C. Raines on behalf of Brassfield, Kim Cargor, Madrey, Norder, Heidi E. Washington for the purposes of the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. (Raines, Austin)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (KMac)
December 21, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Staying Case on Richard Brent Kilbourne. Document mailed to Richard Brent Kilbourne, Pris. No. 190446, G. ROBERT COTTON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 3500 N. ELM ROAD, JACKSON, MI 49201. (KMac)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $28.33 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (DJen)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (MCho)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (DJen)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Richard Brent Kilbourne. (DJen)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Richard Brent Kilbourne against Brassfield, Kim Cargor, Madrey, Norder, Heidi E. Washington (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DJen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilbourne v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Brent Kilbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi E. Washington
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Cargor
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norder
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brassfield
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madrey
Represented By: Austin C. Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?