Runnals v. Fifth Third Bank
Plaintiff: Mark W Runnals
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Case Number: 5:2014cv11710
Filed: April 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER STRIKING #9 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Mark W Runnals pursuant R11 (Proposed Orders) fo Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures - Entered by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (FMos)
July 22, 2014 Filing 9 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mark W Runnals (Jackson, Renette)
July 10, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Scheduling Conference held on 7/10/2014 - Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/24/2014 at 10:00 AM on whether the parties have settled the case. If not, scheduling order will be entered based on dates in Discovery Plan.) Disposition: Plaintiff's counsel Renette Jackson to provide the motgage loan documents to defense counsel by the close of business on July 10, 2014. (FMos)
July 2, 2014 Filing 8 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Kogan, Jane)
June 11, 2014 RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference RESET to 7/10/2014 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy in ANN ARBOR, MI (FMos)
May 28, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2014 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy in ANN ARBOR, MI (FMos)
May 27, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/27/2014 - Disposition: The parties both agreed that Judge Levy could continue to preside over the case. (FMos)
May 27, 2014 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jane M. Kogan appearing on behalf of Fifth Third Bank (Kogan, Jane)
May 20, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/20/2014 - Disposition: The parties to jointly call in by Tuesday, May 27th at 10:00 a.m. regarding possibly reassignment/recusal. (FMos)
May 16, 2014 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Fifth Third Bank. (Ghaussi, Homayune)
May 13, 2014 Filing 4 `NOTICE of reassignment from District Judge Marianne O. Battani to District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor pursuant to Administrative Order 14-AO-030. (SSch)
May 7, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2014 03:30 PM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (REFER TO IMAGE FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (BThe)
May 1, 2014 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (KKra)
April 30, 2014 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fifth Third Bank identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bankcorp for Fifth Third Bank. (Ghaussi, Homayune)
April 29, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fifth Third Bank from Genesee County Circuit Court, case number 14-102049-CH. Receipt No: 0645-4617642 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Ghaussi, Homayune)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runnals v. Fifth Third Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark W Runnals
Represented By: Renette Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Jane M. Kogan
Represented By: Homayune A. Ghaussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?