Solo et al v. United Parcel Service Co.
Plaintiff: Joe Solo and BleachTech L.L.C.
Defendant: United Parcel Service Co.
Case Number: 5:2014cv12719
Filed: July 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Judith E. Levy
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying Defendant's "Ex-Parte" 106 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Stay or Dismiss Proceedings 76 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S 40 MOTION to Compel AnswersTo Plaintiffs' Interrogatory No. 1 and Brief in Support - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 66 Motion to Redact Portions of the Transcript from the Hearing Held on August 30, 2016 - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie) Modified on 10/4/2016 (CCie).
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 66 Motion to Redact Portions of the Transcript from the Hearing Held on August 30, 2016 - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' 5 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solo et al v. United Parcel Service Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Solo
Represented By: Andrew J. McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BleachTech L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew J. McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?