Damus v. Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al.

Defendant: Ronald Vitiello, Rebecca Adducci, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kathy Rose and Jefferson Sessions
Petitioner: Ansly Damus
Respondent: Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 5:2018cv12821
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Freda Levenson on behalf of Ansly Damus. (Levenson, Freda)
October 30, 2018 Filing 22 SUR-REPLY re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ansly Damus. (Hausman, David)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER Expediting the Motion Hearing on Defendants #12 & #14 MOTIONS to Dismiss. (Sur-Reply due by 10/30/2018 and Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2018 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
October 26, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #19 Reply to Response to Motion, #16 Notice of Hearing on Motion Seeking Expedited Hearing or Decision and Petitioner Sur-Reply by Ansly Damus (Hausman, David)
October 25, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY to Response re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rebecca Adducci, Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Sessions. (Carty, James)
October 16, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to Response re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ansly Damus. (Hausman, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David Joseph Carey on behalf of Ansly Damus. (Carey, David)
October 11, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING on #12 MOTION to Dismiss and #14 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #14 MOTION to Dismiss. (SBur)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Kathy Rose. (Smith, David)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #12 MOTION to Dismiss. (SBur)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Rebecca Adducci, Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kathy Rose, Jefferson Sessions, Ronald Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Decision and Order Denying Asylum, #3 Exhibit 2 - Credible Fear Worksheet, #4 Exhibit 3 - First IJ Decision, #5 Exhibit 4 - Record of Sown Statement, #6 Exhibit 5 - BIA Decision, September 29, 2017, #7 Exhibit 6 - Second IJ Decision, #8 Exhibit 7 - BIA Decision, July 5, 2018, #9 Exhibit 8 - Class Action Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 - Facebook photos) (Carty, James)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER Granting in Part Respondent's #7 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Response due by 10/12/2018, Reply due by 10/19/2018) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting in Part Respondent's #7 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Response due by 10/12/2018) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Smith on behalf of Kathy Rose. (Smith, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ansly Damus. (Hausman, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Kathy Rose. (Smith, David)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James J. Carty appearing on behalf of Rebecca Adducci, Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kathy Rose, Jefferson Sessions, Ronald Vitiello (Carty, James)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Hausman on behalf of Ansly Damus. (Hausman, David)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Service re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Response due by 10/9/2018 and Reply due by 10/16/2018) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ansly Damus (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Elizabeth Ford, #3 Exhibit 1.A-Parole Request, #4 Exhibit 1.B-Parol Denial, #5 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Ansly Damus) (Tan, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Tan on behalf of Ansly Damus. (Tan, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ansly Damus against All Defendants, Receipt No: 0645-6898549 - Fee: $ 5. (Steinberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damus v. Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ansly Damus
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Represented By: Michael K. Tan
Represented By: David Joseph Carey
Represented By: Freda Levenson
Represented By: David Hausman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Adducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: James J. Carty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?