Holistic Health Inkster, Inc et al v. Inkster, City of et al

Plaintiff: Samantha Bevins, Holistic Hwealth Inkster Inc and Holistic Health Inkster, Inc
Defendant: Felicia Rutledge, Byron Nolen and Inkster, City of
Case Number: 5:2018cv12895
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: David R. Grand
1 Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 11 NOTICE OF HEARING on #7 MOTION to Remand. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2018 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
October 31, 2018 10 REPLY to Response re #7 MOTION to Remand to Wayne County Circuit Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hall, Cyril)
October 24, 2018 9 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand to Wayne County Circuit Court Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand this lawsuit to the Circuit Court for the County of Wayne, State of Michigan and Certificate of Service filed by All Defendants. (Jones, David)
October 10, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: The Scheduling Conference on October 22, 2018 is Cancelled. (SBur)
October 10, 2018 8 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #7 MOTION to Remand. (SBur)
October 10, 2018 7 MOTION to Remand to Wayne County Circuit Court by Samantha Bevins, Holistic Health Inkster, Inc. (Hall, Cyril)
September 27, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Henri O. Harmon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Harmon, Henri)
September 21, 2018 5 Featured Case Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (NAhm)
September 21, 2018 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2018 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
September 21, 2018 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Pioch, Neil)
September 18, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Jones on behalf of All Defendants. (Jones, David)
September 18, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 18-010089-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-6905630 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Pioch, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holistic Health Inkster, Inc et al v. Inkster, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Rutledge
Represented By: Neil B. Pioch
Represented By: David W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Nolen
Represented By: Neil B. Pioch
Represented By: David W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inkster, City of
Represented By: Neil B. Pioch
Represented By: David W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Bevins
Represented By: Henri O. Harmon
Represented By: Cyril C. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holistic Hwealth Inkster Inc
Represented By: Henri O. Harmon
Represented By: Cyril C. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holistic Health Inkster, Inc
Represented By: Henri O. Harmon
Represented By: Cyril C. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?