Nanografix Corporation v. Pollard Banknote Limited
Plaintiff: Nanografix Corporation
Defendant: Pollard Banknote Limited
Case Number: 5:2019cv10624
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's #11 Motion to Bifurcate Trial and Stay Damages. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER. (Informal Technology Tutorial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy and Claim Construction Hearing set for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) (Refer to image for additional dates) Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
April 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Scheduling Conference held on 4/22/2019. (SBur)
April 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2019 re #11 MOTION to Bifurcate Damages. Disposition: Motion Granted in Part and Denied in Part. (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (SBur)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
April 16, 2019 Filing 20 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Stipulated Protective Order), #2 Exhibit B (Nanografix's Proposal), #3 Exhibit C (Pollard's Proposal)) (Baltzer, Kourtney)
April 4, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response re #11 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Damages filed by Pollard Banknote Limited. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Kornfield, Susan)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of Attorney Withdrawal with stipulation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SSch)
March 28, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Damages filed by Nanografix Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7) (Kennedy, Linda)
March 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Paul Bagdady on behalf of Pollard Banknote Limited. (Bagdady, Justin)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bill C. Panagos on behalf of Nanografix Corporation. (Panagos, Bill)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Kennedy on behalf of Nanografix Corporation. (Kennedy, Linda)
March 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: ***TIME CHANGE ONLY*** Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING on #11 MOTION to Bifurcate. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #11 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Damages. (SBur)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Damages by Pollard Banknote Limited. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (Kornfield, Susan)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Serra on behalf of Pollard Banknote Limited. (Serra, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Kornfield on behalf of Pollard Banknote Limited. (Kornfield, Susan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kourtney N. Baltzer on behalf of Pollard Banknote Limited. (Baltzer, Kourtney)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell E. Levine on behalf of Pollard Banknote Limited. (Levine, Russell)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Docket Sheet from California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-06735. Modified on 3/4/2019 (VLun).
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTES OF Defendant Pollard Banknote Limited's Motion to Transfer to the Eastern District of Michigan Pursuant to 28 USC section 1404(a) 26 before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears further argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. The Court would GRANT the Motion and transfer the matter to the Eastern District of Michigan. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Katie E Thibodeaux. Case transferred electronically. (jp)[Transferred from cacd on 3/4/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND, Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Nanografix Corporation filed by Defendant Pollard Banknote Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Schweitzer, Lauren) [Transferred from cacd on 3/4/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Nanografix Corporation. (Meyer, Derek) [Transferred from cacd on 3/4/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22206368 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Nanografix Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Attorney Derek J Meyer added to party Nanografix Corporation(pty:pla))(Meyer, Derek) [Transferred from California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-06735]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nanografix Corporation v. Pollard Banknote Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanografix Corporation
Represented By: Linda Kennedy
Represented By: Bill C. Panagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pollard Banknote Limited
Represented By: Russell E. Levine
Represented By: Kourtney N. Baltzer
Represented By: Susan M. Kornfield
Represented By: Justin Paul Bagdady
Represented By: Michael J. Serra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?