Graham Sr et al v. Detroit Country Day School et al
Plaintiff: LaNard Graham Jr, LaNard Graham Sr and Wenona Graham
Defendant: Glen Shilling, Mark Bray, Detroit Country Day School and Tim Beardon
Case Number: 5:2019cv10804
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Non-Party Student Education Records. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
July 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/3/2019. (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (SBur)
July 1, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: ***TIME CHANGE ONLY*** TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. Please use the following call-in information: 888.363.4734; Access Code: 2541474 (SBur)
July 1, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Status Conference reset for 7/3/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. Please use the following call-in information: 888.363.4734; Access Code: 2541474 (SBur)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Telephonic Status Conference re Discovery Dispute set for 7/2/2019 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. Please use the following call-in information: 888.363.4734; Access Code: 2541474 (SBur)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/16/2019, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/16/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy and Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Refer to image for additional dates) (SBur)
May 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Scheduling Conference held on 5/21/2019. (SBur)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Moore on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Moore, Joshua)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Mandel, Scott)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Thompson, Nicole)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2019 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Detroit Country Day School (Mandel, Scott)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Tim Beardon, Mark Bray, Detroit Country Day School, Glen Shilling. (Mandel, Scott)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Thompson, Nicole)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
March 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7157900 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Thompson, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham Sr et al v. Detroit Country Day School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaNard Graham Jr
Represented By: Nicole L. Thompson
Represented By: Joshua L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaNard Graham Sr
Represented By: Nicole L. Thompson
Represented By: Joshua L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenona Graham
Represented By: Nicole L. Thompson
Represented By: Joshua L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Shilling
Represented By: Scott L. Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bray
Represented By: Scott L. Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Country Day School
Represented By: Scott L. Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Beardon
Represented By: Scott L. Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?