Simmons v. Southfield, City of et al
Plaintiff: Latausha Simmons
Defendant: Southfield, City of, James Craig, Southfield Police Department, Detroit, City of, Curry, Cross Nelson, Ross Towing, Joseph Thomas, Jr., Duncan, Doso P. Thomas, K. Miller, Williams, John Doe, A. Carr, Detroit Police Department, A. Sharp and Dunning
Case Number: 5:2019cv11726
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. A. Carr served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; James Craig served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Detroit Police Department served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Detroit, City of served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Duncan served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Dunning served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; K. Miller served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Cross Nelson served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Ross Towing served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019; A. Sharp served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Southfield Police Department served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Southfield, City of served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Doso P. Thomas served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; Joseph Thomas, Jr served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Williams served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (DPer)
August 5, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in opposition to #18 Answer to complaint and affirmative defenses by Latausha Simmons. (DPer)
August 5, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION FOR CLAIM AND DELIVERY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by K. Miller, A. Sharp, Southfield Police Department, Southfield, City of, Joseph Thomas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hammond v. City of Troy) (Burress, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #11 Answer by Latausha Simmons. (DPer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 EMERGENCY MOTION for claim and delivery and injunctive relief by Latausha Simmons. (DPer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by K. Miller, A. Sharp, Southfield Police Department, Southfield, City of, Joseph Thomas, Jr. (Burress, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by K. Miller, A. Sharp, Southfield Police Department, Southfield, City of, Joseph Thomas, Jr. (Seward, T.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Berger on behalf of K. Miller, A. Sharp, Southfield Police Department, Southfield, City of, Joseph Thomas, Jr. (Berger, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kali M. L. Henderson on behalf of K. Miller, A. Sharp, Southfield Police Department, Southfield, City of, Joseph Thomas, Jr. (Henderson, Kali)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 EMERGENCY MOTION for claim and delivery by Latausha Simmons. (DPer)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Burress on behalf of K. Miller, A. Sharp, Southfield Police Department, Southfield, City of, Joseph Thomas, Jr. (Burress, David)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Joseph Seward on behalf of K. Miller, A. Sharp, Southfield Police Department, Southfield, City of, Joseph Thomas, Jr. (Seward, T.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Detroit, City of City of Detroit's Answer to Complaint (Domin, Sarah)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by James Craig, Detroit, City of. (Domin, Sarah)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued for *A. Carr, James Craig, Curry, Detroit Police Department, Detroit, City of, Duncan, K. Miller, Cross Nelson, Ross Towing, A. Sharp, Southfield Police Department, Southfield, City of, Doso P. Thomas, Joseph Thomas, Jr, Williams* (DPer)
June 14, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Notice to Plaintiff Regarding Service of Process mailed to Latausha Simmons, 20500 Dean, Detroit, MI 48234. (LHos)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Plaintiff Regarding Service of Process. (LHos)
June 13, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge and #7 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees on Latausha Simmons at 20500 Dean, Detroit MI 48234. (SBur)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub and #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Notice Waiving Service by U.S. Marshal by Latausha Simmons (DPer)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Latausha Simmons. (DPer)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for claim and delivery possession pendng judgment, temporary restraining order, injunctive and declaratory relief by Latausha Simmons. (DPer)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Latausha Simmons against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Southfield, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield, City of
Represented By: Michael T. Berger
Represented By: Kali M. L. Henderson
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: David D. Burress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Craig
Represented By: Sarah V. Domin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield Police Department
Represented By: Michael T. Berger
Represented By: Kali M. L. Henderson
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: David D. Burress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit, City of
Represented By: Sarah V. Domin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Thomas, Jr.
Represented By: Michael T. Berger
Represented By: Kali M. L. Henderson
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: David D. Burress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doso P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Miller
Represented By: Michael T. Berger
Represented By: Kali M. L. Henderson
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: David D. Burress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Sharp
Represented By: Michael T. Berger
Represented By: Kali M. L. Henderson
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: David D. Burress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latausha Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?