Droesser et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Fowlkes, Matthew Parker, Trevor Wentz, Jeffrey A. Ford and Mark William Droesser
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv12365
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of All Defendants. (Douglas, Stephanie)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER VACATING #4 Order of Reassignment of Companion Case. This case is not a companion to 19-MD-2901. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EKar)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Motion for Transfer to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion for Transfer) (Berman, Steve)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor to District Judge Sean F. Cox in Detroit. (NAhm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Hilliard, Robert)
August 12, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Ford Motor Company* (DWor)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by Matthew Parker, Mark William Droesser, Jeffrey Fowlkes, Jeffrey A. Ford, Trevor Wentz against Ford Motor Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7358810 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Northern District of California, 3:18-cv-6967-JD, Judge James Donato] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1 - Truck & Engine Mfrs. Ass'n website, #4 Exhibit 2 - Ford Warranty Action Notice No. 10-2011, #5 Exhibit 3 - Diesel Fuel Lubricity Additives study, #6 Exhibit 4 - ULSD Fact Sheet, #7 Exhibit 5 - J. Thijssen LLC article, #8 Exhibit 6 - Infineum Worlwide presentation, #9 Exhibit 7 - 12/16/09 Santiago email, #10 Exhibit 8 - FIE Mfrs. Common Position Statement, #11 Exhibit 9 - Hardison & Pearce article, #12 Exhibit 10 - 1/20/12 Ford Response to NHTSA Inquiry EA11-003, #13 Exhibit 11 - 9/2/09 Email from Audi to Bosch, #14 Exhibit 12 - 3/22/11 Email from Bosch to Volkswagen, #15 Exhibit 13 - Bosch spreadsheet, #16 Exhibit 14 - 10/21/04 Eastman email, #17 Exhibit 15 - 11/17/09 Fulton email chain, #18 Exhibit 16 - 11/13/09 Wang email, #19 Exhibit 17 - 9/17/10 Fulton email, #20 Exhibit 18 - A new Era in Ford Diesel Technology for Pickups Starts Now, #21 Exhibit 19 - 11/23/09 Baker email, #22 Exhibit 20 - Ford Warranty Action Notice No, 10-2011 App'x F1, #23 Exhibit 21 - Ford Warranty Action Notice No, 10-2011 App'x O, #24 Exhibit 22 - Ford Part 573 Safety Recall Report, #25 Exhibit 23 - Recall Alert: 2015-2016 Ford Transit, #26 Exhibit 24 - My Big Ford Drum is Broke, #27 Exhibit 25 - 2011 Duramax and up fuel pump problems, #28 Exhibit 26 - Online sales listing for Ford 6.7 CP4.2 bypass kit, #29 Exhibit 27 - Online sales listing for LML Duramax CP3 conversion kit, #30 Exhibit 28 - 2011 Ford Super Duty brochure, #31 Exhibit 29 - 2012 Ford Super Duty brochure, #32 Exhibit 30 - 2013 Ford Super Duty brochure, #33 Exhibit 31 - 2014 Ford Super Duty brochure, #34 Exhibit 32 - 2015 Ford Super Duty brochure, #35 Exhibit 33 - 2016 Ford Super Duty brochure, #36 Exhibit 34 - 2017 Ford Super Duty brochure, #37 Exhibit 35 - 2018 Ford Super Duty brochure, #38 Exhibit 36 - 2018 Ford Super Duty Owners Manual, #39 Exhibit 37 - 2017 Ford Super Duty Owners Manual, #40 Exhibit 38 - 2016 Ford 6.7 Power Stroke Owner Manual Diesel Supplement, #41 Exhibit 39 - 2015 Ford 6.7 Power Stroke Owner Manual Diesel Supplement, #42 Exhibit 40 - 2014 Ford 6.7 Power Stroke Owner Manual Diesel Supplement, #43 Exhibit 41 - 2013 Ford 6.7 Power Stroke Owner Manual Diesel Supplement, #44 Exhibit 42 - 2012 Ford 6.7 Power Stroke Owner Manual Diesel Supplement, #45 Exhibit 43 - 2011 Ford 6.7 Power Stroke Owner Manual Diesel Supplement) (Berman, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Droesser et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Fowlkes
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Parker
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Wentz
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Ford
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark William Droesser
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?