Sikora v. Ford Motor Company
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Petitioner: Joseph Anthony Sikora
Case Number: 5:2019cv12458
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ford Motor Company served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (DPer)
August 26, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order Dismissing Case on Joseph Anthony Sikora at 19615 Bethel Chruch Rd., Washtenaw, MI 48158. (SBur)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Dismissing Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SBur)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
August 21, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400 by Joseph Anthony Sikora - Receipt No. DET124877. [Recipt processed on 8/26/2019] [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (NAhm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Ford Motor Company* (NAhm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Anthony Sikora against Ford Motor Company Receipt No: Paid - Fee: $ 400. (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sikora v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Anthony Sikora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?