Certainteed Corporation v. Ciraulo Brothers Building Supply, d/b/a Square Deal Building Company
Plaintiff: Certainteed Corporation
Defendant: Ciraulo Brothers Building Company, d/b/a Square Deal Building Supply
Case Number: 5:2019cv12620
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Deadline for Response to Counter-Complaint. Responsive pleading due by 11/8/2019. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (MacKay, K)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ciraulo Brothers Building Company, d/b/a Square Deal Building Supply (Sarconi, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 COUNTERCLAIM filed by Ciraulo Brothers Building Company, d/b/a Square Deal Building Supply against Ciraulo Brothers Building Company, d/b/a Square Deal Building Supply (Sarconi, James) [COUNTERCLAIM FILED AGAINST CERTAINTEED CORPORATION] Modified on 10/8/2019 (DPer).
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Ciraulo Brothers Building Company, d/b/a Square Deal Building Supply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Counter-Affidavit of Account Stated) (Sarconi, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Certainteed Corporation served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Boettcher, Matthew)[CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE UPON THE DEFENDANT] Modified on 10/8/2019 (DPer).
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elyse K. Stegner appearing on behalf of Ciraulo Brothers Building Company, d/b/a Square Deal Building Supply (Stegner, Elyse)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lawrence M. Scott appearing on behalf of Ciraulo Brothers Building Company, d/b/a Square Deal Building Supply (Scott, Lawrence)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James J. Sarconi appearing on behalf of Ciraulo Brothers Building Company, d/b/a Square Deal Building Supply (Sarconi, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED #3 Errata Sheet by Certainteed Corporation (AMENDED EXHIBIT B TO COMPLAINT) - INCORRECTLY NAMED IN (DN. 3) (Boettcher, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA Sheet re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Certainteed Corporation. by Certainteed Corporation (Amended Exhibit C) to Complaint (Boettcher, Matthew)
September 6, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Ciraulo Brothers Building Company, d/b/a Square Deal Building Supply* (SOso)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Certainteed Corporation against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7395015 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: State of Pennsylvania - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Credit Application, #3 Exhibit B - Invoice, #4 Exhibit C - Correspondence, #5 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Account Stated) (Boettcher, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certainteed Corporation v. Ciraulo Brothers Building Supply, d/b/a Square Deal Building Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J. Boettcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciraulo Brothers Building Company, d/b/a Square Deal Building Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?