Custom Ecology of Ohio, Inc. d/b/a Stansley Industries, Inc. v. Michigan Waste Energy, Inc. d/b/a Detroit Renewable Power
Plaintiff: Custom Ecology of Ohio, Inc. d/b/a Stansley Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Michigan Waste Energy, Inc. d/b/a Detroit Renewable Power
Case Number: 5:2019cv12893
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Case Management Status and Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph W. Barber, I appearing on behalf of Custom Ecology of Ohio, Inc. d/b/a Stansley Industries, Inc. (Barber, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Michigan Waste Energy, Inc. d/b/a Detroit Renewable Power. (Spencer, Khalilah)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Raechel T.X. Conyers on behalf of Michigan Waste Energy, Inc. d/b/a Detroit Renewable Power. (Conyers, Raechel)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Khalilah V. Spencer on behalf of Michigan Waste Energy, Inc. d/b/a Detroit Renewable Power. (Spencer, Khalilah)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michigan Waste Energy, Inc. d/b/a Detroit Renewable Power served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Dunn, Stephen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michigan Waste Energy, Inc. d/b/a Detroit Renewable Power served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Dunn, Stephen)
October 4, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Michigan Waste Energy, Inc. d/b/a Detroit Renewable Power* (DAll)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by Custom Ecology of Ohio, Inc. d/b/a Stansley Industries, Inc. against Michigan Waste Energy, Inc. d/b/a Detroit Renewable Power with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7431376 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Dunn, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Custom Ecology of Ohio, Inc. d/b/a Stansley Industries, Inc. v. Michigan Waste Energy, Inc. d/b/a Detroit Renewable Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Waste Energy, Inc. d/b/a Detroit Renewable Power
Represented By: Raechel T.X. Conyers
Represented By: Khalilah V. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Custom Ecology of Ohio, Inc. d/b/a Stansley Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P. Dunn
Represented By: Joseph W. Barber, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?