BR IP Holder LLC et al v. Mike & Ray's Ice Cream, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Baskin Robbins Franchising LLC and BR IP Holder LLC
Defendant: Mike & Ray's Ice Cream, Inc. and Rosenthal Neal
Case Number: 5:2019cv13131
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (SSch)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Nayak, Mahesh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Alan Lossing re #11 Notice of Hearing on Motion, Affidavit of Service by All Plaintiffs (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING on #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Response due by 11/15/2019 Reply due by 11/29/2019 Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mike & Ray's Ice Cream, Inc. served on 10/26/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Rosenthal Neal served on 10/26/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Doyle on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Doyle, Peter)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Martone on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Martone, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs identifying Corporate Parent Dunkin Brands Group, Inc. for BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin Robbins Franchising LLC. (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Notices to Cure, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Termination, #5 Exhibit Unpublished Opinions) (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Nayak, Mahesh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Rosenthal Neal * (DPer)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Mike & Ray's Ice Cream, Inc.* (DPer)
October 25, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7459963 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Notices to Cure, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Termination) (Nayak, Mahesh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BR IP Holder LLC et al v. Mike & Ray's Ice Cream, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baskin Robbins Franchising LLC
Represented By: Mahesh K. Nayak
Represented By: James A. Martone
Represented By: Peter E. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BR IP Holder LLC
Represented By: Mahesh K. Nayak
Represented By: James A. Martone
Represented By: Peter E. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike & Ray's Ice Cream, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosenthal Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?