NUNEZ et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: David Lyndon Johns, Robert W. Kirby, Gustavo Nicolas Gonzalez, Philip A. Adams, Jace Reyes, Gina Carter, Gregory R. Nix, Mark A. Cagle, Paul A. Ponteaux Sr., James Gregg Simmons, Ricky J. Tremblay, Michael Corbett, Abner Nunez, Kenneth Blair, Robert D Peters, James Childs and Eric Mobley
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv10010
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
3 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren A. Akers on behalf of Philip A. Adams, Gina Carter, Michael Corbett, Gustavo Nicolas Gonzalez, David Lyndon Johns, Robert W. Kirby, Eric Mobley, Gregory R. Nix, Robert D Peters, Paul A. Ponteaux Sr., Jace Reyes, Ricky J. Tremblay. (Akers, Lauren)
January 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant A. Newman on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Newman, Grant)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford in Detroit to District Judge Judith E. Levy and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Ann Arbor. (NAhm)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Hilliard on behalf of Abner Nunez. (Hilliard, Robert)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Douglas, Stephanie)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek J. Linkous on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Linkous, Derek)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerrod C. Patterson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Patterson, Jerrod)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve W. Berman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Docket Sheet from Florida Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-25211.
January 3, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Southern District of Florida. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 62 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) [Transferred from flsd on 1/3/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Change Venue by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dominguez, Brian) [Transferred from flsd on 1/3/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by RICKY J. TREMBLAY, GREGORY R. NIX, JAMES CHILDS, MICHAEL CORBETT, GINA CARTER, JACE REYES, ROBERT D. PETERS, DAVID LYNDON JOHNS, ROBERT W. KIRBY, MARK A. CAGLE, JAMES GREGG SIMMONS, PAUL A. PONTEAUX SR., ABNER NUNEZ, ERIC MOBLEY, KENNETH BLAIR, GUSTAVO NICOLAS GONZALEZ, PHILIP A. ADAMS.(Felix, Andrew) [Transferred from flsd on 1/3/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11235504, filed by RICKY J. TREMBLAY, GREGORY R. NIX, JAMES CHILDS, MICHAEL CORBETT, GINA CARTER, JACE REYES, ROBERT D. PETERS, DAVID LYNDON JOHNS, ROBERT W. KIRBY, MARK A. CAGLE, JAMES GREGG SIMMONS, PAUL A. PONTEAUX SR., ABNER NUNEZ, ERIC MOBLEY, KENNETH BLAIR, GUSTAVO NICOLAS GONZALEZ, PHILIP A. ADAMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Felix, Andrew)[Transferred from Florida Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-25211.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NUNEZ et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lyndon Johns
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Kirby
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Nicolas Gonzalez
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip A. Adams
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jace Reyes
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Carter
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory R. Nix
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Cagle
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Ponteaux Sr.
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gregg Simmons
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky J. Tremblay
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Corbett
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abner Nunez
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Blair
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D Peters
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Childs
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Mobley
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren A. Akers
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Courtney Crook Shytle
Represented By: Perry W. Miles, IV
Represented By: Grant A. Newman
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Represented By: Derek J. Linkous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?