Coward et al v. Richard Snyder et al
Plaintiff: E. B., Monica Embeck, Romell Barkus, I. T., Lisa Matos, B. B., Carrie Handy, D. T., Alexis Freeman, Natassia Thompson, Tyshae Keys, M. C., S. J., Lakeitha Webster, E. C., Richard Lee Mcneal, Larry White, Ralph Golidy, Margaret Clark, Jonathan Embeck, T. W., Fannie Houston, Sheena Swanigan, Angel McLilly, Sylvester Ford, Jerry Elliot, Ryan Strang, Joanne Schmidt-Sharp, T. E., Raycine Burton, M. F., Bianca Torbet, Harlee Turner, Clyde Edwards, Chinanna Brown, J. K., Paul Flowers, Jr., Laura McSwain, Jennice Badon, Jacquese Braswell, E. W., Mark Cromwell, J. W., Nitisha Smith, Judy L. Emberton, Carlee Cornett Junior, Crystal Freels, Deon Bradley, Fiora Fields, Malandia Meeks, Paris Bryson, Champion Gray, Damon C Dawson, Gloria McBride, Agnes Greene, Meoceana Callahan, Roberta Truzinski, Bernice Johnson, Lakesia Read, Remi Boone, Jimmie Brown, Coby Wilhem-Cobbs, Jermaine Summers, David Burton, A. W., Carol Kiniry, L. B., Paula Wilson, Alana Brown, Richard L Diamond, M. B., G. W., Timothy Jackson, Michelle Rodriguez, Glen R Woods, Tammy Brown, Edward Coward, Carla Roberts, D. F., Latoya Alfred, J. H., M. J. C., Tyler Miller, Lawrence Marks, Faneisha Smith-Price, Dwayne Brown, Dewynta Wade, Gregory Tiggs, Dior Clements, Kyranai Bridges, Porsha Fluker, Carlton E Billings, Randall Gary, S. C., Eric Weststrock, Octavia Roberts, K. B., Jerry Sr. Brackett, A. C., Jeffrey Keith, Sheila Pollard, N. W., A. S., H. B., Lakisha Johnson, Lawenda Anderson, Sirena Coleman, Rosemary Griggs, Chad Chiles, Samuel Tedford, Autumn Chandler, Tressa Troutman, Erick Jerome Cooper, Monesa Batson, Casanya Brown, Weldon Ward, Charlene McFadden, Lodia Holt, Yvonne Thomas-Redwine, Joseph Gaines, Dennis R Brown, David Boone, Sue Cromwell, Myra Woods, A. L., Tony Bowers, X. W., Dezrelon Gaddy, D. B., M. M., Milas Caudle, Mattie Crockett, Deana Dickerson, T. B., Michael Beavers, Tracy Frazier, Stephen Crowder, Vanessa Harrell, Jecorey Hawkins, Chantel Alfred, Darrell Campbell, L. W., Aurelio Vickers, Yvonne Curtis, Anika Anderson, Ebony Kw Campbell, C. G., Curtiss Stewart, Michele Cooper, Donald Nard, Minnie Aubrey, Edward Hawkins, Ronald R Woods, Rita Dorsey, Mattie B Truss, Melissa Jobe, Norman Booker, Frank Edgeston, M. W. and S. B.
Defendant: Bradley Wurfel, Michael Prysby, Howard Croft, Adam Rosenthal, Michael Glasgow, Andy Dillon, Daugherty Johnson, Patrick Cook, The City of Flint, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C., LEO A. DALY COMPANY;, Gerald Ambrose, Veolia North America, Inc., Darnell Earley, Veolia North America LLC, Stephen Busch, Rowe Professional Services Company, f/k/a Rowe Engineering, Inc., Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC, Governor Richard Snyder and Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv10307
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Denise Page Hood
2 Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY CONFERENCE PROTOCOL. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
March 23, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by James M. Campbell on behalf of Veolia North America LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Campbell, James)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE IMPLEMENTING PARTIAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 54(b) AND 58(a). Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 23, 2022 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference on 2/23/2022 is Cancelled (WBar)
January 26, 2022 RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 2/23/2022 01:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
December 22, 2021 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 12/22/2021, ( Status Conference set for 1/26/2022 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
October 27, 2021 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 10/27/2021 (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
October 8, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Alannah Buford-Kamerman by LEO A. DALY COMPANY;, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
September 29, 2021 RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/27/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
August 25, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 8/25/2021, ( Status Conference set for 9/29/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
July 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 7/27/2021, ( Status Conference set for 8/25/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
June 28, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference RESET for 7/27/2021 03:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
May 26, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 5/26/2021, ( Status Conference set for 6/30/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
April 7, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 4/7/2021, ( Status Conference set for 5/26/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
March 4, 2021 Filing 58 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. identifying Other Affiliate Lockwood Andrews Newnam Inc. for Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
March 4, 2021 Filing 57 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Leo A. Daly for Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc.. (Erickson, Philip)
March 4, 2021 Filing 56 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LEO A. DALY COMPANY; identifying Other Affiliate Lockwood Andrews Newnam Inc. for LEO A. DALY COMPANY;. (Erickson, Philip)
February 26, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Non-Party Fault by LEO A. DALY COMPANY;, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Erickson, Philip)
February 26, 2021 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
February 26, 2021 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by LEO A. DALY COMPANY;. (Erickson, Philip)
February 24, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 2/24/2021, ( Status Conference set for 4/7/2021 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying as moot #31 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 19, 2021 Filing 51 STIPULATION re #36 MOTION to Dismiss by LEO A. DALY COMPANY;, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Erickson, Philip)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #51 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #50 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
February 8, 2021 Filing 50 STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary by Veolia North America LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Devine, Alaina)
February 3, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE by Gerald Ambrose, Howard Croft, Darnell Earley, The City of Flint, Michael Glasgow, Daugherty Johnson of withdrawal of #29 MOTION to Dismiss . (Kim, William)
January 13, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 1/13/2021, ( Status Conference set for 2/24/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
December 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 12/2/2020, ( Status Conference set for 1/13/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
November 25, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman on behalf of LEO A. DALY COMPANY;, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Buford-Kamerman, Alannah)
November 25, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY to Response re #36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LEO A. DALY COMPANY;, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #46 Stipulation filed by LEO A. DALY COMPANY;, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
November 17, 2020 Filing 46 STIPULATION re #44 Response to Motion by LEO A. DALY COMPANY;, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Erickson, Philip)
October 30, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION re #44 Response to Motion by LEO A. DALY COMPANY;, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Erickson, Philip)
October 28, 2020 RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Next Status Conference adjourned to 12/2/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (WBar)
October 21, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
October 1, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY to Response re #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The City of Flint. (Klein, Sheldon)
September 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 9/30/2020, ( Next Status Conference set for 10/28/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court Grants the Stipulation to Extend Time for City Defendants to File Their Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #41 ). SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (Sandusky, K)
September 16, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE to #30 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint filed by Veolia North America LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Devine, Alaina)[REPLY IN SUPPORT OF #30 MOTION TO DISMISS SHORT FORM COMPLAINT] Modified on 9/16/2020 (DPer).
September 16, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION re #29 MOTION to Dismiss to Extend Time for City Defendants to File Their Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Gerald Ambrose, Howard Croft, Darnell Earley, The City of Flint, Michael Glasgow, Daugherty Johnson (Klein, Sheldon)
September 3, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in City Defendants' Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 26, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 8/26/2020, ( Status Conference set for 9/30/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #38 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
August 25, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint by Veolia North America LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC (Devine, Alaina)
August 25, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #30 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
July 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video Status Conference held on 7/29/2020, ( Next Status Conference set for 8/26/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
July 15, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss by LEO A. DALY COMPANY;, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Erickson, Philip)
June 26, 2020 Filing 35 STIPULATION re #31 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in City Defendants' Motion by All Plaintiffs (Lanciotti, Patrick)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #35 Stipulation re #31 MOTION to Dismiss; Response due by 8/19/2020, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #32 MOTION for Extension of Time, and #34 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
June 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video Status Conference held on 6/24/2020, ( Next Status Conference set for 7/29/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (WBar)
June 24, 2020 Filing 34 STIPULATION re #29 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Shkolnik, Hunter)
June 11, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Santino Mateo on behalf of Darnell Earley. (Mateo, T.)
June 8, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint Unopposed by All Plaintiffs. (Shkolnik, Hunter)
June 4, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in City Defendants' Motion by Stephen Busch, Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby, Bradley Wurfel. (Barbieri, Charles)
May 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video Status Conference held on 5/20/2020, ( Next Video Status Conference set for 6/24/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
May 19, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Short Form Complaint by Veolia North America LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart) (Devine, Alaina)
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by The City of Flint. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Klein, Sheldon)
April 23, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Alaina N. Devine on behalf of Veolia North America LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Devine, Alaina)
April 23, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Veolia North America LLC, Veolia North America, Inc., Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC. (Campbell, James)
April 21, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Erickson on behalf of LEO A. DALY COMPANY;, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
April 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Video/Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/15/2020, ( Video Status Conference set for 5/20/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy)(See Case No. 16-10444 for video conference access information) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
April 13, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE FOR APRIL 15, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE (WBar)
April 6, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista A. Jackson on behalf of Stephen Busch. (Jackson, Krista)
April 6, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Grashoff, Jr on behalf of Stephen Busch. (Grashoff, Philip)
April 1, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michael Prysby waiver sent on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
April 1, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Patrick Cook waiver sent on 4/1/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
April 1, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison M. Collins appearing on behalf of Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby (Collins, Allison)
April 1, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles E. Barbieri appearing on behalf of Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby (Barbieri, Charles)
March 31, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Pattwell appearing on behalf of Bradley Wurfel (Pattwell, Michael)
March 31, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Governor Richard Snyder waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Andy Dillon waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Stephen Busch waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Bradley Wurfel waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Clare on behalf of Bradley Wurfel. (Clare, Christopher)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon H. Klein on behalf of The City of Flint. (Klein, Sheldon)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Kuhl on behalf of Andy Dillon, Governor Richard Snyder. (Kuhl, Richard)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Gambill on behalf of Andy Dillon, Governor Richard Snyder. (Gambill, Nathan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A. Bettenhausen on behalf of Andy Dillon, Governor Richard Snyder. (Bettenhausen, Margaret)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Young Kim appearing on behalf of The City of Flint (Kim, William)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Gerald Ambrose waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Howard Croft waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Darnell Earley waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; The City of Flint waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Michael Glasgow waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Daugherty Johnson waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Lanciotti, Patrick)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick A. Berg on behalf of The City of Flint. (Berg, Frederick)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander S. Rusek on behalf of Howard Croft. (Rusek, Alexander)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Barry A. Wolf appearing on behalf of Gerald Ambrose (Wolf, Barry)
March 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 3/11/2020, ( In-Person Status Conference set for 4/15/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Denise Page Hood in Detroit to District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor. (NAhm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7592102 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Lansing. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 16 cv 10444, Judge Judge Judith E. Levy] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Shkolnik, Hunter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coward et al v. Richard Snyder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. B.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Embeck
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romell Barkus
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. T.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Matos
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. B.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Handy
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. T.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Freeman
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natassia Thompson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyshae Keys
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. C.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. J.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeitha Webster
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. C.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lee Mcneal
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry White
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Golidy
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Clark
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Embeck
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Houston
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheena Swanigan
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel McLilly
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Ford
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Elliot
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Strang
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Schmidt-Sharp
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. E.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raycine Burton
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. F.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Torbet
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlee Turner
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Edwards
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chinanna Brown
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. K.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Flowers, Jr.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura McSwain
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennice Badon
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquese Braswell
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Cromwell
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nitisha Smith
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy L. Emberton
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlee Cornett Junior
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Freels
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deon Bradley
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiora Fields
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malandia Meeks
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paris Bryson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Champion Gray
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon C Dawson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria McBride
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes Greene
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meoceana Callahan
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Truzinski
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakesia Read
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remi Boone
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Brown
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coby Wilhem-Cobbs
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Summers
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Burton
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Kiniry
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. B.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Wilson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Brown
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Diamond
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. B.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Jackson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Rodriguez
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen R Woods
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Brown
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Coward
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Roberts
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. F.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Alfred
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. H.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. J. C.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Miller
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Marks
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faneisha Smith-Price
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Brown
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewynta Wade
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Tiggs
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dior Clements
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyranai Bridges
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porsha Fluker
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton E Billings
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Gary
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Weststrock
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavia Roberts
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. B.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Sr. Brackett
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. C.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Keith
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Pollard
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. S.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. B.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakisha Johnson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawenda Anderson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sirena Coleman
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Griggs
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Chiles
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Tedford
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn Chandler
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tressa Troutman
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Jerome Cooper
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monesa Batson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casanya Brown
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weldon Ward
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene McFadden
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodia Holt
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Thomas-Redwine
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gaines
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis R Brown
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Boone
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Cromwell
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Woods
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. L.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Bowers
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dezrelon Gaddy
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. B.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. M.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milas Caudle
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie Crockett
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deana Dickerson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. B.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Beavers
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Frazier
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Crowder
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Harrell
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jecorey Hawkins
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantel Alfred
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Campbell
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelio Vickers
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Curtis
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anika Anderson
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Kw Campbell
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. G.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtiss Stewart
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Cooper
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Nard
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnie Aubrey
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hawkins
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R Woods
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Dorsey
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie B Truss
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Jobe
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Booker
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Edgeston
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. W.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. B.
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Wurfel
Represented By: Michael J. Pattwell
Represented By: Christopher B. Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Prysby
Represented By: Charles E. Barbieri
Represented By: Allison M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Croft
Represented By: Alexander S. Rusek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Dillon
Represented By: Nathan A. Gambill
Represented By: Margaret A. Bettenhausen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daugherty Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cook
Represented By: Charles E. Barbieri
Represented By: Allison M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Flint
Represented By: Frederick A. Berg
Represented By: William Young Kim
Represented By: Sheldon H. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.
Represented By: Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEO A. DALY COMPANY;
Represented By: Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Ambrose
Represented By: Barry A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia North America, Inc.
Represented By: Alaina N. Devine
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darnell Earley
Represented By: T. Santino Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia North America LLC
Represented By: Alaina N. Devine
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Busch
Represented By: Krista A. Jackson
Represented By: Philip A. Grashoff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowe Professional Services Company, f/k/a Rowe Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia Water North America Operating Services, LLC
Represented By: Alaina N. Devine
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Richard Snyder
Represented By: Nathan A. Gambill
Represented By: Margaret A. Bettenhausen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc.
Represented By: Alannah M. Buford-Kamerman
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?