Williamson et al v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: N. W.2, Annie Natt, Marla Garland, Lucius Atikins, Craig Owens, N. W.1, Margie Ernest, James Horne, Margaret Braddock, Tiara Garland, Milton Gordon, Alma Hill, Eleanor Wicker, Gladys Williamson, Thelma Sawyer, R. S., Mary Hulman, T. S., Linda Goldsberry, Darwin Groves, Steven Bowen, Clea Horne, Florlissa Stebbins, Charles Goldsberry, Zella Ward and Quadriyah Muhammad
Defendant: Bradley Wurfel, Leo A. Daly Company, Darnell Earley, Howard Croft, Michael Glasgow, Adam Rosenthal, Veolia, LLC, Veolia, Inc., Governor Richard D. Snyder, Andy Dillon, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C., Rowe Professional Services Company f/k/a Rowe Enginnering, Inc., Daugherty Johnson, City of Flint, Veolia Water, LLC, Stephen Busch, Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby, Gerald Ambrose and Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv10330
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
2 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick A. Berg on behalf of City of Flint. (Berg, Frederick)
April 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon H. Klein on behalf of City of Flint. (Klein, Sheldon)
April 2, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander S. Rusek on behalf of Howard Croft. (Rusek, Alexander)
April 2, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Barry A. Wolf appearing on behalf of Gerald Ambrose (Wolf, Barry)
April 2, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Young Kim appearing on behalf of City of Flint (Kim, William)
April 1, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles E. Barbieri appearing on behalf of Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby (Barbieri, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison M. Collins appearing on behalf of Patrick Cook, Michael Prysby (Collins, Allison)
April 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Non-Party Fault by Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C. (Erickson, Philip)
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael J. Pattwell appearing on behalf of Bradley Wurfel (Pattwell, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Clare on behalf of Bradley Wurfel. (Clare, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Kuhl on behalf of Andy Dillon, Governor Richard D. Snyder. (Kuhl, Richard)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A. Gambill on behalf of Andy Dillon, Governor Richard D. Snyder. (Gambill, Nathan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A. Bettenhausen on behalf of Andy Dillon, Governor Richard D. Snyder. (Bettenhausen, Margaret)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Leo A. Daly Company. (Erickson, Philip)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Erickson on behalf of Leo A. Daly Company, Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc., Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.. (Erickson, Philip)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-List of Plaintiffs) (Giroux, Robert)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #7 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Short Form Complaint. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
March 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Status Conference held on 3/11/2020, ( In-Person Status Conference set for 4/15/2020 03:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy) (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Short Form Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 3/4/20 Email from Defense Counsel, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed First Amended Complaint) (Glazer, Heather)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER striking #4 Amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (DPer)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Heather A. Glazer appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Glazer, Heather)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 03/5/20 ORDER] AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-List of Plaintiffs) (Giroux, Robert) Modified on 3/6/2020 (DPer).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Sean F. Cox in Detroit to District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor. (NAhm)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SOso)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7594337 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Lansing. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC, Eastern District, 16-cv-10444, Judge Judith E. Levy] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-List of Platiffs) (Giroux, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson et al v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Wurfel
Represented By: Michael J. Pattwell
Represented By: Christopher B. Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo A. Daly Company
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darnell Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Croft
Represented By: Alexander S. Rusek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Richard D. Snyder
Represented By: Nathan A. Gambill
Represented By: Margaret A. Bettenhausen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Dillon
Represented By: Nathan A. Gambill
Represented By: Margaret A. Bettenhausen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, P.C.
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowe Professional Services Company f/k/a Rowe Enginnering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daugherty Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Flint
Represented By: Frederick A. Berg
Represented By: William Young Kim
Represented By: Sheldon H. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia Water, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cook
Represented By: Charles E. Barbieri
Represented By: Allison M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Prysby
Represented By: Charles E. Barbieri
Represented By: Allison M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Ambrose
Represented By: Barry A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockwood Andrews & Newnam, Inc.
Represented By: Philip A. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. W.2
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Natt
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Garland
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucius Atikins
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Owens
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. W.1
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Ernest
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Horne
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Braddock
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiara Garland
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Gordon
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Hill
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Wicker
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Williamson
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Sawyer
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. S.
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hulman
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. S.
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Goldsberry
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwin Groves
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bowen
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clea Horne
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florlissa Stebbins
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Goldsberry
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zella Ward
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quadriyah Muhammad
Represented By: Robert M. Giroux
Represented By: Heather A. Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?