Malam v Rebecca Adducci et al
Plaintiff: Janet Malam
Defendant: Detroit Field Office Rebecca Adducci, Dep Dir ICE MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, ICE/DHS ICE/DHS, MDOC Director HEIDI E. WASHINGTON, US AG WILLIAM P BARR and Sec. DHS Chad F. Wolf
Intervenor Plaintiff: Ruby Briselda Escobar, Min Dan Zhang, Guo Yan Lin Castro, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Baldemar Barajas Santoyo, Qaid Alhalmi, Jose Mauricio Garcia Toledo, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Sergio Brito, Jose Gomez Santiz, Isaac Orta Vieyra, Amer Toma, Rudy Sosa Carillo and Julio Fernando Medina Euceda
Amicus Curiae: Rights Behind Bars
Case Number: 5:2020cv10829
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY ZOOM WEBINAR: Zoom Status Conference set for 6/5/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
June 4, 2020 Filing 94 RESPONSE to #91 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct #43 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Rebecca Adducci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email re Medical Waiver) (Newby, Jennifer)
June 3, 2020 Filing 93 MOTION to Expedite Consideration by Qaid Alhalmi, Baldemar Barajas Santoyo, Sergio Brito, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Guo Yan Lin Castro, Ruby Briselda Escobar, Jose Mauricio Garcia Toledo, Jose Gomez Santiz, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Isaac Orta Vieyra, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Rudy Sosa Carillo, Amer Toma, Min Dan Zhang. (Rhee, Jeannie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 92 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit B - Proposed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order with Supporting Declarations re #91 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct #43 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by Qaid Alhalmi, Baldemar Barajas Santoyo, Sergio Brito, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Guo Yan Lin Castro, Ruby Briselda Escobar, Jose Mauricio Garcia Toledo, Jose Gomez Santiz, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Isaac Orta Vieyra, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Rudy Sosa Carillo, Amer Toma, Min Dan Zhang. (Rhee, Jeannie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 91 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct #43 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by Qaid Alhalmi, Baldemar Barajas Santoyo, Sergio Brito, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Guo Yan Lin Castro, Ruby Briselda Escobar, Jose Mauricio Garcia Toledo, Jose Gomez Santiz, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Isaac Orta Vieyra, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Rudy Sosa Carillo, Amer Toma, Min Dan Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, #3 Exhibit B - Proposed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order with Supporting Declarations (Redacted)) (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 SECOND OPINION and ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AS A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #44 , Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER sealing docket entries. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (DPer) (Main Document 89 replaced on 5/20/2020) (DPer).
May 19, 2020 Filing 88 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Janet Malam (Stacer, Andrew)
May 19, 2020 Filing 87 REDACTED VERSION of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Janet Malam (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Stacer, Andrew)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #81 MOTION Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae filed by Rights Behind Bars. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
May 18, 2020 Filing 86 SEALED EXHIBIT 6-Declaration of Dr. Katherine Peeler re #82 Supplemental Brief,, by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang. (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 18, 2020 Filing 85 SEALED EXHIBIT 5-Declaration of My Khanh Ngo, Esq. re #82 Supplemental Brief,, by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang. (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 18, 2020 Filing 84 SEALED EXHIBIT 4-Declaration of Dr. Whitney Lieb re #82 Supplemental Brief,, by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang. (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 18, 2020 Filing 83 SEALED EXHIBIT 1-Declaration of Emanuel Rosales Borboa re #82 Supplemental Brief,, by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang. (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 18, 2020 Filing 82 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #44 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Emanuel Rosales Borboa (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Jennipher L.M. Colthirst, Esq., #4 Exhibit 3-Declaration of Aaron E. Haier, #5 Exhibit 4-Declaration of Dr. Whitney Lieb (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 5-Declaration of My Khanh Ngo, Esq., #7 Exhibit 6-Declaration of Dr. Katherine Peeler (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 7-Declaration of Dr. Homer Venters) (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 18, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by Rights Behind Bars. (Cummings, Sheila)
May 18, 2020 Filing 80 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #44 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rebecca Adducci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hypertension Article, #2 Exhibit Scissors Declaration, #3 Exhibit Asthma Guidelines) (Newby, Jennifer)
May 15, 2020 Filing 79 REDACTED VERSION of #57 Reply to Response to Motion, (Redacted Exhibit 1) by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 78 REDACTED VERSION of #47 Exhibit, Declaration of Homer Venters by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 77 REDACTED VERSION of #44 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Redacted Exhibits 3, 6, 7, 9, 10, 11, and 12) by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12) (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 76 REDACTED VERSION of #43 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by Qaid Alhalmi, Baldemar Barajas Santoyo, Sergio Brito, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Guo Yan Lin Castro, Ruby Briselda Escobar, Jose Mauricio Garcia Toledo, Jose Gomez Santiz, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Isaac Orta Vieyra, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Rudy Sosa Carillo, Amer Toma, Min Dan Zhang (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 75 REDACTED VERSION of #37 Response to Order to Show Cause, (Redacted Reply Brief, Exhibits 1 & 4) by Amer Toma (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 4) (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 74 REDACTED VERSION of #27 Reply to Response to Motion by Amer Toma (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 73 REDACTED VERSION of #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Redacted Exhibits 4 & 5) by Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5) (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 72 REDACTED VERSION of #17 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER to Unseal Cases. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (SSch)
May 13, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE by Rebecca Adducci re #62 Order re Sensitive Information (Newby, Jennifer)
May 13, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE by Qaid Alhalmi, Baldemar Barajas Santoyo, Sergio Brito, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Guo Yan Lin Castro, Ruby Briselda Escobar, Jose Mauricio Garcia Toledo, Jose Gomez Santiz, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Isaac Orta Vieyra, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Rudy Sosa Carillo, Amer Toma, Min Dan Zhang re: Plaintiffs' List of Docket Entries that Contain Sensitive Information (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part #44 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
May 12, 2020 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2020. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jeseca C. Eddington) (Number of Pages: 57) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 6/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2020. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Eddington, J)
May 11, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang re #44 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order / Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion and Order) (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
May 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Zoom Webinar Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2020 re #44 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Min Dan Zhang, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Qaid Alhalmi, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria; Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #63 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
May 6, 2020 Filing 64 SUR-REPLY re #44 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rebecca Adducci. (Newby, Jennifer)
May 6, 2020 Filing 63 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Unopposed) by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Rebecca Adducci, WILLIAM P BARR, ICE/DHS, Chad F. Wolf. (Darling, Bradley)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SECOND ORDER Regarding Public Access. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
May 6, 2020 Filing 61 STATEMENT of Plaintiffs Regarding Public Access to Docket by Qaid Alhalmi, Baldemar Barajas Santoyo, Sergio Brito, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Guo Yan Lin Castro, Ruby Briselda Escobar, Jose Mauricio Garcia Toledo, Jose Gomez Santiz, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Isaac Orta Vieyra, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Rudy Sosa Carillo, Amer Toma, Min Dan Zhang (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 6, 2020 Filing 60 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #56 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings -- Defendants Response to Order Regarding Public Access filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Rebecca Adducci, WILLIAM P BARR, ICE/DHS, Chad F. Wolf. (Darling, Bradley)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #59 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Evidence. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #58 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
May 5, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Evidence by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang. (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 5, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang. (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 5, 2020 Filing 57 REPLY to Response re #44 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Supplemental declaration of Dr. Homer Venters, #3 Exhibit 2-Declaration of My Khanh Ngo) (Rhee, Jeannie)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REGARDING PUBLIC ACCESS; Objections due by 12:00 p.m. EST on 5/6/2020, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
May 1, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF ZOOM VIDEO HEARING on #44 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
May 1, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Darling on behalf of MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Rebecca Adducci, WILLIAM P BARR, ICE/DHS, Chad F. Wolf. (Darling, Bradley)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #45 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #51 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Rebecca Adducci. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 29, 2020 Filing 52 RESPONSE to #44 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rebecca Adducci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Obaid Declaration, #2 Exhibit Kanakry Declaration, #3 Exhibit Saunders Declaration, #4 Exhibit Mitchell Declaration, #5 Exhibit Quinn Declaration, #6 Exhibit McClain Declaration, #7 Exhibit ERO PRR, #8 Exhibit Jacobs Declaration, #9 Exhibit Calhoun Guidance, #10 Exhibit CDC High-Risk, #11 Exhibit CDC Guidance) (Newby, Jennifer)
April 29, 2020 Filing 51 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Rebecca Adducci. (Newby, Jennifer)
April 29, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY to Response re #45 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, Status Reports, and Client Access filed by Qaid Alhalmi, Baldemar Barajas Santoyo, Sergio Brito, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Guo Yan Lin Castro, Ruby Briselda Escobar, Jose Mauricio Garcia Toledo, Jose Gomez Santiz, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Isaac Orta Vieyra, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Rudy Sosa Carillo, Amer Toma, Min Dan Zhang. (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 28, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE to #45 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, Status Reports, and Client Access filed by Rebecca Adducci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fraihat v. ICE Class Certification, #2 Exhibit Telephone Policy) (Newby, Jennifer)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Requiring Response to #44 Motion for TRO, Response due by 4:00 p.m. on 4/29/2020 Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 27, 2020 Filing 47 EXHIBIT 3 - Corrected Declaration of Homer Venters re #44 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Requiring Response to #45 Motion to Expedite; Response due by 4:00 p.m. on 4/28/2020, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 27, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, Status Reports, and Client Access by Qaid Alhalmi, Baldemar Barajas Santoyo, Sergio Brito, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Guo Yan Lin Castro, Ruby Briselda Escobar, Jose Mauricio Garcia Toledo, Jose Gomez Santiz, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Isaac Orta Vieyra, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Rudy Sosa Carillo, Amer Toma, Min Dan Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: Proposed Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit B: Proposed Requests for Production, #4 Exhibit C: Proposed Deposition Notice, #5 Exhibit D: Declaration of Darren Gardner, #6 Exhibit E: ICE Guidance on COVID-19, April 14, 2020, #7 Exhibit F: ICE Guidance on COVID-19, April 24, 2020, #8 Exhibit G: Chief Judge John J. McConnell Jr., General Order Directing the Warden of the Donald W. Wyatt Detention Facility to File Status Reports (Apr. 16, 2020), Minutes (In Chambers), #9 Exhibit H: Fraihat, et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, et al., EDCV 19-1546 JGB (SHKx), ECF No. 132 at 3839 (C.D. Cal. Apr. 20, 2020), #10 Exhibit I: Gayle v. Meade, No. 20-21553-COOKE/GOODMAN, 2020 WL 1949737 (S.D. Fla. Apr. 22, 2020), #11 Exhibit J: Jones v. Wolf, No. 1:20-cv-00361-LJV, ECF No. 44 (W.D.N.Y. Apr. 2, 2020)., #12 Exhibit K: Order Regarding Petitioners/Plaintiffs Emergency Motion Regarding Coercion and Interference with Class Members (ECF 307), Hamama v. Adducci, No. 2:17-cv-11910, ECF No. 316 (E.D. Mich. June 20, 2018)) (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 26, 2020 Filing 44 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Qaid Alhalmi, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Min Dan Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jonathan Louis Golob, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Robert B. Greifinger, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Homer Venters, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Dora Schriro, #6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of My Khanh Ngo, #7 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Heather Garvock, #8 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Richard Kessler, #9 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Jonathan Contreras, #10 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Joseph Hughes, #11 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Caterina Amaro-Luedtke, #12 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Kai De Graaf, #13 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Reynaldo Albino-Martinez) (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 26, 2020 Filing 43 Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Class Action) filed by Amer Toma, Ruby Briselda Escobar, Tomas Cardona Ramirez, Isaac Orta Vieyra, Guo Yan Lin Castro, Rudy Sosa Carillo, Sergio Brito, Jose Mauricio Garcia Toledo, Emanuel Rosales Borboa, Damary Rodriguez Salabarria, Qaid Alhalmi, Min Dan Zhang, Julio Fernando Medina Euceda, Baldemar Barajas Santoyo, Jose Gomez Santiz against MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Rebecca Adducci, WILLIAM P BARR, ICE/DHS, Chad F. Wolf, Receipt No: AMIEDC-7763371 - Fee: $ 5. (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 22, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Silberstein-Loeb on behalf of Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma. (Silberstein-Loeb, Jonathan)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPINION and ORDER Converting #29 Temporary Restraining Order, into Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 21, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by My Khanh Ngo on behalf of Amer Toma. (Ngo, My Khanh)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Extending Temporary Restraining Order #29 . Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #38 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Evidence filed by Amer Toma. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 21, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Evidence by Amer Toma. (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 21, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Toma by Amer Toma. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ruby Briselda Escobar, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of My Khanh Ngo, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Dora Schriro, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Amer Toma) (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #34 Motion for extension of TRO, expedited discovery, and extension of deadline to reply to response to order to show cause. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) Modified on 4/19/2020 (WBar).
April 18, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #34 MOTION TO EXTEND Temporary Restraining Order and Deadline to File Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Rebecca Adducci. (Newby, Jennifer)
April 18, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION TO EXTEND Temporary Restraining Order and Deadline to File Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause , MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Amer Toma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expedited Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Expedited Requests for Production of Documents) (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION and ORDER Converting #23 Temporary Restraining Order, into Preliminary Injunction, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 16, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY to Response re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Janet Malam. (Stacer, Andrew)
April 14, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Toma by Rebecca Adducci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jacobs Supp Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2-28-20 Sick Call, #3 Exhibit 4-3-20 Sick Call) (Newby, Jennifer)
April 10, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Rebecca Adducci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jacobs Supp Declaration) (Newby, Jennifer)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part #20 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #28 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 8, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma. (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 8, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response re #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma. (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 7, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED #25 Response to Motion by Rebecca Adducci (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Whalen Declaration, #2 Exhibit Obaid Declaration) (Newby, Jennifer)
April 7, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rebecca Adducci. (Newby, Jennifer)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER for Responses to #20 Motion for TRO; Response due no later than 2:00 p.m. on 4/7/2020 Reply due no later than 10:00 a.m. on 4/8/2020 Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED OPINION and ORDER Granting in Part #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 5, 2020 Filing 20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Dr. Jonathan Louis Golob, #3 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Dr. Robert B. Greifinger, M.D., #4 Exhibit 3: Declaration of My Khanh Ngo, Esq., Attorney for Intervenor-Plaintiffs, #5 Exhibit 4: Declaration of Ronald Kaplovitz, Esq., Attorney for Amer Toma, #6 Exhibit 5: Declaration of Farrah Hobballah, Esq., Attorney for Ruby Briselda Escobar, #7 Exhibit 6: Declaration of Pay Par Gai) (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 5, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rebecca Adducci. (Newby, Jennifer)
April 5, 2020 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #6 Supplemental Brief, #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Janet Malam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Counsel) (Stacer, Andrew)
April 5, 2020 Filing 17 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Injunctive Relief filed by Amer Toma, Ruby Briselda Escobar against MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Rebecca Adducci, WILLIAM P BARR, ICE/DHS, HEIDI E. WASHINGTON, Chad F. Wolf, Receipt No: AMIEDC-7722508 - Fee: $ 5. (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/3/2020 re #8 MOTION to Intervene. Disposition: Motion granted (Court Reporter: Christin Russell) (WBar)
April 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/3/2020 re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Janet Malam. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Christin Russell) (WBar)
April 3, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION by Pay Par Gai re #8 MOTION to Intervene and Brief in Support (Supplemental Declaration in Support) filed by Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 3, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Intervene and Brief in Support filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Rebecca Adducci, WILLIAM P BARR, ICE/DHS, Chad F. Wolf. (Newby, Jennifer)
April 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Cesilia Andrade on behalf of Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma. (Andrade, Monica)
April 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Korobkin on behalf of Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma. (Korobkin, Daniel)
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Miriam J. Aukerman on behalf of Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma. (Aukerman, Miriam)
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Rebecca Adducci, WILLIAM P BARR, ICE/DHS, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Salavtera Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - CDC Guidelines, #3 Exhibit C - Jacobs Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - CDC Testing) (Newby, Jennifer)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 MOTION to Expedite Consideration. TELEPHONE Motion Hearing re #8 MOTION to Intervene set for 4/3/2020 04:45 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Consideration by Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma. (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene and Brief in Support by Ruby Briselda Escobar, Amer Toma. (Rhee, Jeannie)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING BY TELEPHONE on #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Follow-up Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2020 04:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy; Response due by noon on 4/3/2020 (WBar)
March 31, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Hearing held on 3/31/2020 re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Follow-up Telephonic Hearing set for 4/3/2020 04:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy; Response due by noon on 4/3/2020. (Court Reporter: Christin Russell) (WBar)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Janet Malam. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit Dr. Amon, #3 Exhibit Dr. Golob) (Stacer, Andrew)
March 31, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING BY TELEPHONE re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2020 04:00 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy***PLEASE USE THE FOLLOWING CALL-IN INFORMATION: (888) 363-4734; Access code: 2541474*** (WBar)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosana Santana Moura Garbacik on behalf of Janet Malam. (Garbacik, Rosana)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Newby on behalf of MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Rebecca Adducci, WILLIAM P BARR, ICE/DHS, Chad F. Wolf. (Newby, Jennifer)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Janet Malam. (Stacer, Andrew)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Janet Malam against All Defendants, Receipt No: AMIEDC-7710920 - Fee: $ 5. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff LPR Card, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff SSD application approval and earnings, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff Medical Records, #5 Exhibit Order of Mandatory Detention, #6 Exhibit Order for Release 9th Cir Ct) (Stacer, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malam v Rebecca Adducci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Field Office Rebecca Adducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep Dir ICE MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE/DHS ICE/DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDOC Director HEIDI E. WASHINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US AG WILLIAM P BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sec. DHS Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Malam
Represented By: Andrew D. Stacer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ruby Briselda Escobar
Represented By: Miriam J. Aukerman
Represented By: Jonathan Silberstein-Loeb
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Monica Cesilia Andrade
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Min Dan Zhang
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Guo Yan Lin Castro
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Emanuel Rosales Borboa
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Tomas Cardona Ramirez
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Baldemar Barajas Santoyo
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Qaid Alhalmi
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jose Mauricio Garcia Toledo
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Damary Rodriguez Salabarria
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sergio Brito
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jose Gomez Santiz
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Isaac Orta Vieyra
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Amer Toma
Represented By: Miriam J. Aukerman
Represented By: My Khanh Ngo
Represented By: Jonathan Silberstein-Loeb
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Monica Cesilia Andrade
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Rudy Sosa Carillo
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Julio Fernando Medina Euceda
Represented By: Jeannie S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rights Behind Bars
Represented By: Sheila C. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?