Dani Liblang et al v. Allen-Michael D. Resnick et al
Plaintiff: The Liblang Law Firm, P.C. and Dani Liblang
Defendant: Neil Gieleghem, Consumer Legal Remedies, Gieleghem Law Office and Allen-Michael D. Resnick
Case Number: 5:2020cv12490
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Allen-Michael D. Resnick, Consumer Legal Remedies, Gieleghem Law Office, Neil Gieleghem. (Horton, William)
October 30, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Allen-Michael D. Resnick, Consumer Legal Remedies, Gieleghem Law Office, Neil Gieleghem. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Summons, #3 Exhibit B-First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-Opinion, #5 Exhibit D-Order to Stay) (Horton, William)
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Seikaly, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Parties filed by All Defendants. (Horton, William)
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Horton, William)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Parties and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Motion to Admit) (Seikaly, William)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Enforce Lien, #3 Exhibit 2 - California Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - proposed Amended Complaint) (Seikaly, William)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Seikaly on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Seikaly, William)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Parties. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2020 03:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
September 22, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 10/19/2020 is Cancelled re #3 Notice to Appear, pending a ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (WBar)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Consumer Legal Remedies (Horton, William)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Gieleghem Law Office (Horton, William)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Horton, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Mogill on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Mogill, Kenneth)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Parties by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Allen-Michael Resnick, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Neil Gieleghem) (Horton, William)
September 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2020 11:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy***Counsel shall review Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 26(f) and file with the Court a joint discovery plan no later than 3 business days before the conference*** (WBar)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William H. Horton appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Horton, William)
September 11, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-010928-CK. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8039307 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint filed in Wayne County Circuit Court, #3 Exhibit B - Motion to Enforce) (Favaro, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dani Liblang et al v. Allen-Michael D. Resnick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Liblang Law Firm, P.C.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Mogill
Represented By: William R. Seikaly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dani Liblang
Represented By: Kenneth M. Mogill
Represented By: William R. Seikaly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Gieleghem
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Favaro
Represented By: William H. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Legal Remedies
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Favaro
Represented By: William H. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gieleghem Law Office
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Favaro
Represented By: William H. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen-Michael D. Resnick
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Favaro
Represented By: William H. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?