MYSLIVECEK v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: DEAN MYSLIVECEK
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv10346
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V., Other Affiliate Stellantis N.V. for FCA US LLC. (D'Aunoy, Stephen)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dave Valley, #3 Exhibit B - 2021 Jeep Warranty Information) (D'Aunoy, Stephen)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nick Suciu, III on behalf of DEAN MYSLIVECEK. (Suciu, Nick)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO #1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 4/12/2021 and ENTERING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas L. Azar, Jr appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Azar, Thomas)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen A. D'Aunoy appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (D'Aunoy, Stephen)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Murray on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Murray, Thomas)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *FCA US LLC* (SKra)
February 17, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by DEAN MYSLIVECEK against FCA US LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8337558 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Klorczyk, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MYSLIVECEK v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray
Represented By: Stephen A. D'Aunoy
Represented By: Thomas L. Azar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEAN MYSLIVECEK
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk, III
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?