White v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Lisa White, Melissa Eisenhart, Kelly Dobransky, Kelly Mayor and Arthur Zadrozny
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv11696
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of Withdrawal of Attorney Thomas J. Murray. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
September 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. King on behalf of FCA US LLC. (King, Stephen)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Mitchell Williams on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Williams, James)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Daniel Miles, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Miles, W.)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Clay Barnett, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Barnett, H.)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Opening Resume of Preliminary Investigation, #3 Exhibit 2 - My Mopar Parts, 2008-2020 Mopar Sliding Door Latch, Right 68030378AG, #4 Exhibit 3 - My Mopar Parts, 2008-2020 Mopar Sliding Door Latch, Left 68030378AG, #5 Exhibit 4 - My Mopar Parts, 2008-2020 Mopar Sliding Door Actuator, Right 5020678AC, #6 Exhibit 5 - My Mopar Parts, 2008-2020 Mopar Sliding Door Actuator, Left 5020678AC, #7 Exhibit 6 - Dodge, 2010 Grand Caravan Brochure, #8 Exhibit 7 - Dodge, 2011 Grand Caravan Brochure, #9 Exhibit 8 - Dodge, 2012 Grand Caravan Brochure, #10 Exhibit 9 - Dodge, 2013 Grand Caravan Brochure, #11 Exhibit 10 - Dodge, 2014 Grand Caravan Brochure, #12 Exhibit 11 - Dodge, 2016 Grand Caravan Brochure, #13 Exhibit 12 - Dodge, 2017 Grand Caravan Brochure, #14 Exhibit 13 - Dodge, 2018 Grand Caravan Brochure, #15 Exhibit 14 - Dodge, 2019 Grand Caravan Brochure, #16 Exhibit 15 - Dodge, 2015 Grand Caravan Brochure, #17 Exhibit 16 - Chrysler, 2012 Town & Country Brochure, #18 Exhibit 17 - Chrysler, 2010 Town & Country Brochure, #19 Exhibit 18 - Chrysler, 2011 Town & Country Brochure, #20 Exhibit 19 - Chrysler, 2013 Town & Country Brochure, #21 Exhibit 20 - Chrysler, 2014 Town & Country Brochure, #22 Exhibit 21 - Chrysler, 2015 Town & Country Brochure, #23 Exhibit 22 - Chrysler, 2016 Town & Country Brochure, #24 Exhibit 23 - Dodge, 1999 Grand Caravan Brochure, #25 Exhibit 24 - Chrysler, 2004 Town & Country Brochure, #26 Exhibit 25 - Chrysler, 2007 Town & Country Brochure) (Miller, E.)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Filing an Amended Complaint and Responsive Briefing Schedule, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas L. Azar, Jr appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Azar, Thomas)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen A. D'Aunoy appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (D'Aunoy, Stephen)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Murray on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Murray, Thomas)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Miller, E.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *FCA US LLC* (DPer)
July 22, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dennis A. Lienhardt appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lienhardt, Dennis)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sharon S. Almonrode appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Almonrode, Sharon)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8546778 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NHTSA Complaints) (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa White
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Eisenhart
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Dobransky
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Mayor
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Zadrozny
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Stephen A. D'Aunoy
Represented By: Stephen W. King
Represented By: Thomas L. Azar, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?