Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 68.48.226.31
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 68.48.226.31
Case Number: 5:2021cv12153
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for leave to serve third-party subpoena. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #4 MOTION (WBar)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 WILLIAMSON Declaration, #2 Stalzer Declaration, #3 Paige Declaration) (Bernier, Joel)
September 16, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 68.48.226.31 with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8616768 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 68.48.226.31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel A. Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 68.48.226.31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?