Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association v. Cartograf USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Plaintiff: Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association
Defendant: Cartograf USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Case Number: 5:2021cv12296
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default JUDGMENT as to *Cartograf USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation*. Reason: *The sum certain amount of $9,754,674.70 cannot be made certain by the Clerk through computation with the supporting documentation provided with the complaint or with the request for clerk's entry of judgment by default.* (DPer)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Cartograf USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation by Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Peart, Nashara)[REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT] Modified on 11/4/2021 (DPer).
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Cartograf USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation* (KBro)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Cartograf USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation by Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association. (Peart, Nashara)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 ERRATA Sheet re: #4 Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed. by Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association -Revised-Answer Due 10-27-21 (Peart, Nashara)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Cartograf USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Peart, Nashara)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Roach on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Roach, Steven)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Cartograf USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation* (SKra)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association against Cartograf USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8634286 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of state - County Where Action Arose: Out of state - County of 1st Defendant: Out of state. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Peart, Nashara)
September 29, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association v. Cartograf USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association
Represented By: Nashara A. Latoya Peart
Represented By: Steven A. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cartograf USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?