Materialize, Inc., a Delaware Corporation v. Materialise, N.V., Joint Stock Company, organized under the laws of Belgium et al
Plaintiff: Materialize, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Defendant: Materialise, N.V., Joint Stock Company, organized under the laws of Belgium and Materialise USA LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv12325
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Curtis Ivy
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Laura Popp-Rosenberg appearing on behalf of Materialize, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Popp-Rosenberg, Laura)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Shelby P. Rokito appearing on behalf of Materialize, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Rokito, Shelby)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Leo Kittay appearing on behalf of Materialize, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Kittay, Leo)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION For Relief From Local Counsel Requirement Under Local Rule 83.20(f)(1) by Materialise USA LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company, Materialise, N.V., Joint Stock Company, organized under the laws of Belgium. (Shimanoff, Eric)
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Materialise, N.V., Joint Stock Company, organized under the laws of Belgium waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Mandell, Barbara)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Materialise USA LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Mandell, Barbara)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Materialise, N.V., Joint Stock Company, organized under the laws of Belgium* (DAll)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Materialise USA LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company* (DAll)
October 4, 2021 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Mandell, Barbara)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Mandell, Barbara)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by Materialize, Inc., a Delaware Corporation against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8638596 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: New York - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Cease and Desist Letter, #2 Exhibit 2-Response to Cease and Desist Letter, #3 Exhibit 3-Defendant's April 13, 2021 Letter) (Mandell, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Materialize, Inc., a Delaware Corporation v. Materialise, N.V., Joint Stock Company, organized under the laws of Belgium et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Materialize, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Barbara L. Mandell
Represented By: Laura Popp-Rosenberg
Represented By: Leo Kittay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Materialise, N.V., Joint Stock Company, organized under the laws of Belgium
Represented By: Eric J. Shimanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Materialise USA LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Eric J. Shimanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?