Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Restaurant Purchasing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. and LC Trademarks, Inc.
Defendant: Restaurant Purchasing Corporation and Sanrita Jones
Case Number: 5:2022cv10757
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Judith E Levy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Restaurant Purchasing Corporation* (LGra)
May 18, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Sanrita Jones* (LGra)
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Restaurant Purchasing Corporation by All Plaintiffs. (Saylor, Larry)
May 17, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sanrita Jones by All Plaintiffs. (Saylor, Larry)
May 2, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Restaurant Purchasing Corporation served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Saylor, Larry)
May 2, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sanrita Jones served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Saylor, Larry)
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Restaurant Purchasing Corporation* (LHos)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Sanrita Jones* (LHos)
April 11, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Saylor, Larry)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LC Trademarks, Inc. (Saylor, Larry)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Saylor, Larry)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8866127 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Saylor, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Restaurant Purchasing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Larry J. Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LC Trademarks, Inc.
Represented By: Larry J. Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restaurant Purchasing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanrita Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?