Albert Industries Ltd. v. NSF International Strategic Registrations, Limited
Plaintiff: Albert Industries Ltd. and Superior Handforge
Defendant: NSF International Strategic Registrations, Limited
Case Number: 5:2022cv13046
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Albert Industries Ltd. (Ellis, Nicholas)
December 28, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 12/28/2022 02:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
December 28, 2022 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/28/2022 (WBar)
December 23, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Albert Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ellis, Nicholas)
December 20, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Albert Industries Ltd. against NSF International Strategic Registrations, Limited. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Ellis, Nicholas)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order CORRECTED TEXT-ONLY ORDER: At the hearing on December 19, 2022, the parties agreed to submit a written report following the rescheduled audit that will begin on or before December 21, 2022. The parties must submit the written report or reports by 10 p.m. Eastern Standard Time on December 23, 2022. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
December 19, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued for *NSF International Strategic Registrations, Limited* (SSch)
December 19, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY to Response re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Albert Industries Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11) (Ellis, Nicholas)
December 19, 2022 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SSch)
December 19, 2022 Minute Entry for Zoom hearing before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2022 re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (LBar)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER - At the hearing held on December 19, 2022, the parties agreed to submit a written report following the rescheduled a that will begin on or before December 21, 2022. The parties must submit the written report or reports by 10 p.m. Eastern Standard Time on December 23, 2022 - Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (LBar)
December 18, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by NSF International Strategic Registrations, Limited. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 (1of 2) Declaration of Curtis Bell II, #3 Exhibit 1 (2 of 2) Declaration of Curtis Bell II, #4 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Donald E. McFarland III) (McCarthy, Patrick)
December 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Wezner on behalf of NSF International Strategic Registrations, Limited. (Wezner, Michelle)
December 17, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. McCarthy on behalf of NSF International Strategic Registrations, Limited. (McCarthy, Patrick)
December 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. FOLLOW-UP Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2022 11:00 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1613526064?pwd=Z0Z3L1dqeXY2TlRzRGhSeEIzM0diUT09 Passcode: 831012 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1613526064# or +16468287666,,1613526064#| (WBar)
December 16, 2022 Filing 6 EXHIBIT 10 re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Albert Industries Ltd. (Ellis, Nicholas)
December 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2022 04:30 PM before District Judge Judith E. Levy |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1615630658?pwd=V3FlbEIvN052eElteDhGVG5za3UxQT09 Passcode: 814189 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1615630658# or +16468287666,,1615630658#| (WBar)
December 16, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jennifer Z. Belveal appearing on behalf of Albert Industries Ltd. (Belveal, Jennifer)
December 16, 2022 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Albert Industries Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9) (Ellis, Nicholas)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Albert Industries Ltd. (Ellis, Nicholas)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Albert Industries Ltd. against NSF International Strategic Registrations, Limited with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9166219 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Ellis, Nicholas)
December 16, 2022 Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Judith E. Levy: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2022 re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; Disposition: Hearing to be continued on 12/19/2022 at 11:00 a.m. (Court Reporter: Jeseca Eddington) (WBar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albert Industries Ltd. v. NSF International Strategic Registrations, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Jennifer Z. Belveal
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Superior Handforge
Represented By: Jennifer Z. Belveal
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSF International Strategic Registrations, Limited
Represented By: Michelle M. Wezner
Represented By: Patrick M. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?