Moore v. Saph
Plaintiff: Ricky Moore
Defendant: J. Saph, E. Parr-Mirza, John Doe, Lynn and Patricia Lamb
Case Number: 5:2023cv11815
Filed: July 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
August 18, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Ricky Moore Pris. No. 716751 at MUSKEGON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 2400 S. SHERIDAN, MUSKEGON, MI 49442. (WBar)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing service without prepayment of costs and authorizing the US Marshal to collect costs after service is made. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $5.83 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
August 1, 2023 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Ricky Moore (NAhm)
July 31, 2023 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (JOwe)
July 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (LGra)
July 27, 2023 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ricky Moore (LGra)
July 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ricky Moore against J. Saph (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (LGra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Saph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Saph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Parr-Mirza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?