Luna v. G & A Baking Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Ivan Luna
Defendant: G & A Baking Company, LLC
Case Number: 5:2023cv12718
Filed: October 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly G Altman
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan Melmed appearing on behalf of Ivan Luna Plaintiff (Melmed, Jonathan)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Laura Supanich appearing on behalf of Ivan Luna Plaintiff (Supanich, Laura)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. G & A Baking Company, LLC served on 11/6/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Young, Jesse)
October 26, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Stoops on behalf of Ivan Luna. (Stoops, Kevin)
October 26, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *G & A Baking Company, LLC* (MCho)
October 26, 2023 Filing 2 [DOCKETING ERROR] SUMMONS Issued for *G & A Baking Company, LLC* (MCho) Modified on 10/26/2023 (MCho).
October 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ivan Luna against G & A Baking Company, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9540126 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join, Luna) (Young, Jesse)
October 26, 2023 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (MCho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna v. G & A Baking Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Luna
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Represented By: Jesse L. Young
Represented By: Jonathan Melmed
Represented By: Laura Supanich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & A Baking Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?