BDD Group, LLC v. Crave Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BDD Group, LLC
Defendant: Crave Franchising, LLC, SAMANTHA RINCIONE and SALVATORE RINCIONE
Case Number: 5:2024cv10035
Filed: January 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Judith E Levy
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by BDD Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Initial Email Inquiry, #3 Exhibit Ex. C- FDD, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Personalized Estimate, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Addendem to Franchise Agreement) (Amine, Kassem)
February 28, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2) filed by BDD Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Initial Email Inquiry, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Franchise Disclosure Document, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Pro Forma, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Personalized Estimate, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Email Re Provost, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - August Loan Increase, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - November 4, 2021 Loan Increase, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - August 29, 2022 Loan Increase, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - 11.30.24 Notice of Default, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - Demand for Possession, #11 Exhibit Ex. K - Email Regarding Royalty Pause, #12 Exhibit Ex. L - Email Regarding Former) (Amine, Kassem)
February 13, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2). Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2024 10:30 AM before District Judge Judith E. Levy (WBar)
February 7, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Crave Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement) (Waslawski, Daniel)
February 7, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(2) by Salvatore Rincione, Samantha Rincione. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Samantha Rincione, #3 Exhibit 1-A Addendum to Franchise Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Salvatore Rincione, #5 Exhibit 2-A - Copy of 09/07/2020 email, #6 Exhibit 2-B - 12/07/2020 email) (Waslawski, Daniel)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Vacating #8 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
January 24, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by BDD Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Crave Franchising, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Rincione Investments) (Amine, Kassem)
January 24, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by BDD Group, LLC against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Initial Email Inquiry, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Franchise Disclosure Document, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Personalized Estimate, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Pro Forma, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Franchise Agreement, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - August 29, 2021 Loan Increase, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - November 4, 2021 Loan Increase, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - August 29, 2022 Loan Increase, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - 11.30.24 Notice of Default, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - Demand for Possession, #11 Exhibit Ex. K - Email Re Royalty Pause, #12 Exhibit Ex. L - Email Re Former Franchisee, #13 Exhibit Ex. M - 2021 FDD) (Amine, Kassem)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause, in writing, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; Show Cause Response due by 1/26/2024, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
January 16, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Scott D. Stoner appearing on behalf of Crave Franchising, LLC, Salvatore Rincione, Samantha Rincione (Stoner, Scott)
January 16, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Zeth D. Hearld appearing on behalf of Crave Franchising, LLC, Salvatore Rincione, Samantha Rincione (Hearld, Zeth)
January 16, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel C. Waslawski appearing on behalf of Crave Franchising, LLC, Salvatore Rincione, Samantha Rincione (Waslawski, Daniel)
January 8, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DJen)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Paul D. Borman in Detroit to District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor. (SSch)
January 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kassem M. Dakhlallah on behalf of BDD Group, LLC. (Dakhlallah, Kassem)
January 8, 2024 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DJen)
January 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by BDD Group, LLC against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9613723 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Initial Email Inquiry, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - 2020 FDD, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Personalized Investment Estimate, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Pro Forma, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Franchise Agreement, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - August 2021 Loan Increase, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - November 2021 Loan Increase, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - August 2022 Loan Increase, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - Notice of Default, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - Demand for Possession, #11 Exhibit Ex. K - Email Re Royalty Pause, #12 Exhibit Ex. L - Email Re Former Franchisee, #13 Exhibit Ex. M - 2021 FDD) (Amine, Kassem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BDD Group, LLC v. Crave Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BDD Group, LLC
Represented By: Kassem Hussein Amine
Represented By: Kassem M. Dakhlallah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crave Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Daniel C. Waslawski
Represented By: Scott D. Stoner
Represented By: Zeth D. Hearld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMANTHA RINCIONE
Represented By: Daniel C. Waslawski
Represented By: Scott D. Stoner
Represented By: Zeth D. Hearld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALVATORE RINCIONE
Represented By: Daniel C. Waslawski
Represented By: Scott D. Stoner
Represented By: Zeth D. Hearld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?