Matchbox Business, LLC
Debtor: Matchbox Business, LLC
Us Trustee: Michael V. Maggio
Trustee: Thomas C. Richardson
Case Number: 1:2024bk01263
Filed: May 9, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Scott W Dales
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2024 Filing 50 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Month Ending May 31, 2024. Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
June 27, 2024 Filing 49 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#25 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
June 27, 2024 Filing 48 Notice of Change of Address for Creditor(s): Mermaid Business, LLC Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
June 17, 2024 Filing 47 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#3 Definitive Order) Filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio (Maggio, Michael)
June 12, 2024 Filing 46 Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 11 Filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio (RE: related document(s)#25 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio). (Maggio, Michael)
June 10, 2024 Filing 45 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#43 Stipulated Motion to Establish a Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice, #44 Order on Motion To Establish a Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Mailing Matrix) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order and Notice of Claims Bar Date (Related Doc #43) Signed on 6/10/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 7/10/2024. (lmj)
June 10, 2024 Filing 43 Ex-Parte Motion to Establish a Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Bylenga, Steven) Modified on 6/11/2024 (dr.).
June 4, 2024 Hearing Held. (RE: related document(s) 6 Matchbox Business, LLC's Emergency Motion for Entry of an Interim and Final Order (A) Authorizing it to Use Cash Collateral; and (B) Providing Adequate Protection and Other Relief [DN 6] - [FINAL] - Adj.) Hearing held - Interim Order ripened into Final Order. (ADI)
June 4, 2024 Hearing Held. (RE: related document(s) 1 Status Conference) Status conference conducted. (ADI)
May 29, 2024 Filing 42 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#40 Application to Employ Casey Young, Stonehenge Consulting, PLC as Accountant, #41 Notice of Opportunity to Object) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Mailing Matrix) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 29, 2024 Filing 41 Notice of Opportunity to Object (related documents #40 Application to Employ) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 29, 2024 Filing 40 Application to Employ Casey Young, Stonehenge Consulting, PLC as Accountant Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B- Declaration of Casey Young in Support of Petition of Stonehenge Consulting, PLC. as Proposed Accountants for Debtor) (Bylenga, Steven)
May 24, 2024 Filing 39 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#36 Schedule of Proposed Salaries and Wages) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 24, 2024 Filing 38 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#11 Scheduling Order, #30 Pre-Status Conference Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Mailing Matrix) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 23, 2024 Filing 37 Corrected Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#33 Application to Employ Steven M. Bylenga of CBH Attorneys & Counselors, PLLC as Attorney for Debtor, #34 Notice of Opportunity to Object) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 23, 2024 Filing 36 Schedule of Proposed Salaries and Wages to be Paid to Employees & Schedule of Insurance Coverage (RE: related document(s)#3 Definitive Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Salaries & Wages #2 Exhibit B- Insurance) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 23, 2024 Filing 35 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#33 Application to Employ Steven M. Bylenga of CBH Attorneys & Counselors, PLLC as Attorney for Debtor, #34 Notice of Opportunity to Object) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Mailing Matrix) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 23, 2024 Filing 34 Notice of Opportunity to Object (related documents #33 Application to Employ) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 23, 2024 Filing 33 Application to Employ Steven M. Bylenga of CBH Attorneys & Counselors, PLLC as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B- Declaration of Steven M. Bylenga) (Bylenga, Steven)
May 22, 2024 Filing 32 BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 05/22/2024. (Admin.)
May 22, 2024 Filing 31 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Notice Date 05/22/2024. (Admin.)
May 21, 2024 Filing 30 Pre-Status Conference Report (RE: related document(s)#11 Scheduling Order) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 17, 2024 Filing 29 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#26 Notice of Remote 341 Meeting of Creditors) Filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio (Maggio, Michael)
May 16, 2024 Filing 28 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#24 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Mailing Matrix) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 16, 2024 Filing 27 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#23 Order (Generic/Motion)) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 16, 2024 Filing 26 Notice of Remote 341 Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on June 12, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. by remote means. Filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio. (Maggio, Michael)
May 16, 2024 Filing 25 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/12/2024 at 02:00 PM at Telephonic Hearing. (Maggio, Michael)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Interim and Final Order (A) Authorizing it to Use Cash Collateral; and (B) Providing Adequate Protection and Other Relief (Related Doc #6) Signed on 5/15/2024. Final Hearing to be held on 6/4/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Dales Courtroom (Courtroom A). (ks)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Granting Debtor's Motion for an Order to (A) Prohibit Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services to Debtor Pending Resolution of any Disputed, Adequate Assurance Requests; and (B) Establish Procedures for Adequate Assurance of Payment (RE: related document(s)#5 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for an Order to (A) Prohibit Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services to Debtor Pending Resolution of any Disputed, Adequate Assurance Requests; and (B) Establish Procedures for Adequate Assurance of Payment filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC). Signed on 5/15/2024 (kap)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Employee Obligations (RE: related document(s)#4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Employee Obligations filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC). Signed on 5/15/2024 (kap)
May 15, 2024 Hearing Held. (RE: related document(s) 5 Debtor's Motion for an Order to (A) Prohibit Utility Providers From Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services to Debtor Pending Resolution of Any Disputed, Adequate Assurance Requests; and (B) Establish Procedures for Adequate Assurance ... [DN 5]) Granted - Steven Bylenga to submit Order. (ADI)
May 15, 2024 Hearing Held. (RE: related document(s) 4 Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Employee Obligations filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC [DN 4]) Granted - Steven Bylenga to submit Order. (ADI)
May 15, 2024 Adjourned Hearing (RE: related document(s) 6 Matchbox Business, LLC's Emergency Motion for Entry of an Interim and Final Order (A) Authorizing it to Use Cash Collateral; and (B) Providing Adequate Protection and Other Relief [DN 6] - [INTERIM]) Interim Order granted - Steven Bylenga to submit Order; Adjourned to Final Hearing to be held on 6/04/24 at 11:00 a.m. Hearing scheduled 06/04/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Dales Courtroom (Courtroom A). (ADI)
May 14, 2024 Filing 21 Amended (related document(s): #4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Employee Obligations filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC) Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Employee Obligations Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 14, 2024 Filing 20 Corrected Proposed Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Interim and Final Order (A) Authorizing it to Use Cash Collateral; and (B) Providing Adequate Protection and Other Relief (RE: related document(s)#6 Motion for Use of Cash Collateral Re: Grand River Bank) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 14, 2024 Filing 19 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#18 Objection) Filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio (Cheney, Matthew)
May 14, 2024 Filing 18 Objection to (related document(s): #4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion) Filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio (Maggio, Michael)
May 13, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance on behalf of Creditor Small Business Administration. (Mazzocco, Nicole)
May 13, 2024 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance on behalf of Interested Party AKF, Inc. dba Fundkite. (Kaminski, Shanna)
May 12, 2024 Filing 15 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order from Chambers. Notice Date 05/12/2024. (Admin.)
May 12, 2024 Filing 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 05/12/2024. (Admin.)
May 10, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Appointment of SubChapter V Chapter 11 Trustee. Thomas C. Richardson added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee)(Cheney, Matthew)
May 10, 2024 Filing 12 Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Employee Obligations, #5 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for an Order to (A) Prohibit Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services to Debtor Pending Resolution of any Disputed, Adequate Assurance Requests; and (B) Establish Procedures for Adequate Assuran, #6 Motion for Use of Cash Collateral Re: Grand River Bank, #9 Order on Motion for Expedited Hearing, #10 Hearing Set (Court's Notice of Hearing)) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Bylenga, Steven)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Scheduling Order Setting Initial Small Business Subchapter V Status Conference (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC). Status conference to be held on 6/4/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Dales Courtroom (Courtroom A). Pre-Status Conference Report Due by 5/21/2024. (Attachments: #1) Signed on 5/10/2024 (kap)
May 10, 2024 Filing 10 Court's Notice of Hearings (RE: related document(s) #4 Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Employee Obligations filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC, #5 Debtor's Motion for an Order to (A) Prohibit Utility Providers From Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services to Debtor Pending Resolution of Any Disputed, Adequate Assurance Requests; and (B) Establish Procedures for Adequate Assurance of Payment filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC, #6 Matchbox Business, LLC's Emergency Motion for Entry of an Interim and Final Order (A) Authorizing it to Use Cash Collateral; and (B) Providing Adequate Protection and Other Relief filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC). Hearings to be held on 5/15/2024 at 10:00 AM Judge Dales Courtroom (Courtroom A). Steven M. Bylenga, Esq. to serve this Notice, the First Day Motions and the Order granting expedited hearing by email, fax, or overnight delivery, by end of business on May 10, 2024 upon the United States Trustees Office for the Western District of Michigan, Michael V. Maggio, Esq., the Subchapter V Trustee (as soon as appointed), all counsel of record, secured creditors, affected utility companies and the 20 largest unsecured creditors. (tas)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Granting Debtor's Ex Parte Motion for an Expedited Hearing of Its First Day Motions (Related Doc #7) Signed on 5/10/2024. Hearing to be held on 5/15/2024 at 10:00 AM Judge Dales Courtroom (Courtroom A) for #4 Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Employee Obligations, #5 Motion for an Order to (A) Prohibit Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services to Debtor Pending Resolution of any Disputed, Adequate Assurance Requests; and (B) Establish Procedures for Adequate Assurance of Payment, #6 Matchbox Business, LLC's Emergency Motion for Entry of an Interim and Final Order (A) Authorizing it to Use Cash Collateral; and (B) Providing Adequate Protection and Other Relief Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC. (kap)
May 10, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance on behalf of Creditor Grand River Bank. (Hall, Lisa)
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 Debtor's Ex Parte Motion for an Expedited Hearing of Its First Day Motions (related documents #4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion, #5 Chapter 11 First Day Motion, #6 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Nathan Orange #2 Exhibit B-Proposed Order) (Bylenga, Steven) Modified on 5/10/2024 (kap).
May 10, 2024 Filing 6 Matchbox Business, LLC's Emergency Motion for Entry of an Interim and Final Order (A) Authorizing it to Use Cash Collateral; and (B) Providing Adequate Protection and Other Relief Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Nathan Orange #2 Exhibit B- Cash Flow Projections #3 Exhibit C- Proposed Order) (Bylenga, Steven) Modified on 5/10/2024 (kap).
May 10, 2024 Filing 5 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for an Order to (A) Prohibit Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services to Debtor Pending Resolution of any Disputed, Adequate Assurance Requests; and (B) Establish Procedures for Adequate Assurance of Payment Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Nathan Orange #2 Exhibit B- Necessary Utility Providers #3 Exhibit C- Proposed Order) (Bylenga, Steven)
May 10, 2024 Filing 4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Employee Obligations Filed by Debtor Matchbox Business, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Nathan Orange #2 Exhibit B-Proposed Order) (Bylenga, Steven)
May 10, 2024 Filing 3 Definitive Order. Signed on 5/10/2024 (ks)
May 9, 2024 Filing 2 BR 2016 Disclosure of Compensation for Steven Mark Bylenga, Debtor's Attorney, Fees: $21579.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Steven Mark Bylenga (Bylenga, Steven)
May 9, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Small Business, SubChapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Matchbox Business, LLC Chapter 11 Plan SubChapter V Due by: 08/7/2024. (Bylenga, Steven)
May 9, 2024 Notice of Appearance Filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio. (Maggio, Michael)
May 9, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-01263) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A17202554, amount $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Matchbox Business, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Matchbox Business, LLC
Represented By: Steven Mark Bylenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Michael V. Maggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Thomas C. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?