Williams v. Grand Rapids Public Library Featured Case

Due Process, Equal Protection claims by patron who says he was told to leave the library because he looked at topless women on his own laptop (not on the Internet). Librarian was not representing library policy, which only forbid \"obscenity\" not nudity, so Library not liable.

Plaintiff: Donald Williams
Defendant: Grand Rapids Public Library
Case Number: 1:2006cv00635
Filed: September 8, 2006
Court: Michigan Western District Court
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell
Referring Judge: Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2007 74
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Grand Rapids Public Library and against Plaintiff Donald Williams on Plaintiff's claim pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Sec. 1983; granting Defendant's 58 motion for summary judgment; denying 62 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
September 21, 2007 71
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that deft's motion for summary judgment 58 be granted and that plf's motion for summary judgment 62 be denied; objections to R&R due within 10 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
September 20, 2007 70
MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville; hearing re: Deft's MOTION 58 for summary judgment and Pltf's MOTION 62 for summary judgment; R&R to issue; (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, dmh)
September 5, 2007 69
REPLY to response to motion 62 (motion for summary judgment) with certificate of mailing filed by Donald Williams (mrs) Modified text on 9/10/2007 (mrs, ).
August 23, 2007 68
CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff Donald Williams to 60 S Division St., SE, Apt. 323, Grand Rapids, MI 49503 (mrs)
August 17, 2007 65
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Grand Rapids Public Library re 64 reply brief (Ophoff, Daniel) Modified text on 8/20/2007 (mrs, ).
August 16, 2007 64
RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for summary judgment with brief 62 filed by Grand Rapids Public Library (Ophoff, Daniel)
July 18, 2007 63
NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding motions for summary judgment [58, 62]: motion hearing is rescheduled for 9/20/2007 at 10:00 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville(Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
July 17, 2007 61
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Grand Rapids Public Library re 58 , 59 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT WITH EXHIBITS (Ophoff, Daniel)
June 19, 2007 56
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Donald Williams for letter requesting review of plaintiff's deposition (elc)
June 11, 2007 55
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Donald Williams for final list of witnesses and exhibits (gjf)
May 24, 2007 54
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Donald Williams re 53 (gjf)
May 10, 2007 52
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Grand Rapids Public Library SUBPOENA AND NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (Ophoff, Daniel)
May 3, 2007 51
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Grand Rapids Public Library DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (Ophoff, Daniel)
March 9, 2007 50
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Grand Rapids Public Library re 49 answer to amended complaint and affirmative defenses (Ophoff, Daniel) Modified on 3/12/2007 to edit text (gjf).
February 27, 2007 48
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Donald Williams re 47 (mrs)
February 22, 2007 46
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Grand Rapids Public Library for Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Ophoff, Daniel)
February 14, 2007 45
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Donald Williams for initial disclosures, request for admissions, and production of documents (mrs)
February 13, 2007 42
MOTION to strike 40 response to motion to amend pleadings and motion for settlement conference with certification of mailing by plaintiff Donald Williams; (mrs)
February 6, 2007 41
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Grand Rapids Public Library re 40 response to motion to amend pleadings and motion for settlement conference (Ophoff, Daniel) Modified on 2/7/2007 to edit text (gjf).
February 2, 2007 39
NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding plf's motions to amend complaint 37 and for settlement conference 38 : motion hearing is rescheduled for 2/14/2007 at 09:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville;(Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
January 25, 2007 38
NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding plf's motion for settlement conference 36 and motion to amend pleadings 37 : responses due by 2/6/2007; motion hearing is set for 2/12/2007 at 09:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville;(Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
December 21, 2006 Opinion or Order 35
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery deadline 6/15/07; dispositive motion deadline 7/15/07; jury trial set for 1/22/2008 at 09:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell; final pretrial conference set for 1/11/2008 at 01:00 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell;signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
December 20, 2006 34
MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville; Case Management Order to issue; (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, dmh)
December 15, 2006 33
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Donald Williams re 32 (mrs, )
December 1, 2006 31
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Donald Williams of settlement proposal (mrs, )
November 22, 2006 Opinion or Order 30
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 12/20/2006 at 11:00 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville; status report due by 12/15/2006; signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
November 17, 2006 29
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Grand Rapids Public Library re 28 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (Ophoff, Daniel)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order 27
ORDER that Plaintiff's appeals re 21 25 are hereby overruled and that the orders of the magistrate judge are affirmed; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, ymc)
November 6, 2006 25
RESPONSE TO 22 order denying motion for default judgment with certificate of mailing filed by plaintiff Donald Williams (mrs, )
November 2, 2006 Opinion or Order 22
ORDER denying 16 plf's motion for default judgment; signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
November 1, 2006 23
MOTION for sanctions with certification of mailing by plaintiff Donald Williams; (gjf, )
October 18, 2006 7
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Grand Rapids Public Library served on 10/10/2006, answer due 10/30/2006 (mrs, )
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order 5
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville; signed by Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Chief Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
September 8, 2006 Opinion or Order 4
ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
September 5, 2006 3
AFFIDAVIT re 1 with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury by plaintiff Donald Williams (cr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Grand Rapids Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Rapids Public Library
Represented By: Daniel A. Ophoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?