Alfenas v. Pantera Partnership et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Leif Alfenas alleges that defendant Pantera Partnership acquiesced to his publication of a non-commercial fan appreciation website at Pantera.com and that defendant had abandoned its rights to the trademark PANTERA.

Plaintiff: Leif Alfenas
Defendant: Pantera Partnership, Vincent Paul Abbott, Philip Hanson Anselmo, Rex Robert Brown and Estate of Darell Lance ("Dimebag Darrell") Abbott
Case Number: 1:2007cv00749
Filed: August 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Senior Judge Richard Alan Enslen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2007 Filing 7
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks on the transfer of a TRADEMARK ACTION to the Eastern District of Michigan (rlw)
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5
ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE granting 3 unopposed motion to transfer case; case is transferred to the Eastern District of Michigan, to enable consolidation with Civil Action No. 2:2007cv13244; signed by Senior Judge Richard Alan Enslen (Senior Judge Richard Alan Enslen, blb)
September 21, 2007 Filing 4
PROPOSED ORDER regarding Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue by plaintiff Leif Alfenas (Grimm, Eric)
August 8, 2007 Filing 2
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks on the filing of a TRADEMARK ACTION (bd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfenas v. Pantera Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leif Alfenas
Represented By: Eric C. Grimm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pantera Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Paul Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Hanson Anselmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Robert Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Darell Lance ("Dimebag Darrell") Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?