Treadwell #124392 v. Almy et al
Plaintiff: Robert Treadwell #124392
Defendant: Ron Almy, Michael Singleton, Chad Hardy and Tony Henry
Case Number: 1:2010cv00560
Filed: June 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Branch
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 JUDGMENT in favor of defendants and against plaintiff; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 72 ; dismissing as moot claims for injunctive relief; granting 62 motion for summary judgment; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, kw)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 48 ; Defendants Henry, Hardy and Almy's motion for summary judgment 19 is construed as Motion to dismiss and to that extent denied and Defendant Singleton's motion for summary judgment 39 is construed as a motion to dismiss and to that extent denied; the remainder of Defendants' Motions for summary judgment [19,39] are dismissed without prejudice; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, aeb)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING PARTIAL SERVICE: dismissing Plaintiff's due process and Eighth Amendment Claims for failure to state a claim; the Court will serve the remaining retaliation claim against all Defendants; the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon Defendants; signed by Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney (Chief Judge Paul L. Maloney, aeb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treadwell #124392 v. Almy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Treadwell #124392
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Almy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?