LaFountain #171248 v. Harry et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Earl LaFountain #171248
Defendant: Shirlee Harry, Brett J. Barbier, Sharon K. Wells-Finos, Dan Hawkins, Unknown Cooley, Bonita Hofner and Carmen Palmer
Case Number: 1:2010cv00943
Filed: September 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Ionia
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Jonker
Presiding Judge: Hugh W. Brenneman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 94 as modified by this Order; the objections of both Plaintiff and Defendants are overruled; motion for summary judgment 77 is granted in part and denied in part; the case will proceed with the First Amendment retaliation claims against Defendants Harry, Hoffner, Wells-Finos, and Barbier; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 68 ; Plaintiff's motion to defer summary judgment proceedings 59 is GRANTED; Defendants' motion for summary judgment 57 is DENIED without prejudice; Plaintiff's motion for l eave to file an enlarged brief 64 is DENIED; Plaintiff's motion for substitute service 53 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Plaintiff's motion for an amended CMO 63 is GRANTED, and the Magistrate Judge is instructed to prepare one consistent with this ruling; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFountain #171248 v. Harry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Earl LaFountain #171248
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirlee Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett J. Barbier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon K. Wells-Finos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonita Hofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?