Home Owners Insurance Company v. Moffitt et al
Plaintiff: Home Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Ronald Moffitt, Cathleen Moffit, A&P Enterprises of Michigan, LLC, United States Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service and Michigan Department of Treasury
Case Number: 1:2011cv00517
Filed: May 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Van Buren
Presiding Judge: Robert Holmes Bell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re the parties' Proposed Final Pretrial Order ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 332 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 245 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MEMORANDUM OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Owners Insurance Company v. Moffitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Tyren R. Cudney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathleen Moffit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&P Enterprises of Michigan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Michael L. Shiparski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?