Douglas #132125 v. Palmer et al
Plaintiff: Leon Douglas #132125
Defendant: Unknown Muzzin, Unknown Martin and Kerry Gobert
Case Number: 1:2015cv00041
Filed: January 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Lapeer
Presiding Judge: Robert Holmes Bell
Presiding Judge: Phillip J. Green
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 114 ; Plaintiff's motion to transfer to new facility 105 is denied; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 73 , 89 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/15/2015.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas #132125 v. Palmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Douglas #132125
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Muzzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Gobert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?