Jones #146246 v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Larry Darnell Jones #146246
Defendant: Unknown Johnson
Case Number: 1:2017cv00406
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Manistee
Presiding Judge: Phillip J. Green
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Jonker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 130 ; Defendant Johnson's Motion for Summary Judgment 112 is granted; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 127 is denied; the Court discerns no good-faith basis for appeal ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 67 , 78 , 85 , 69 , 77 , 49 and Affirming Magistrate Judge's Decision; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones #146246 v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Darnell Jones #146246
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?