Lee #791018 v. Tinerella et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Lee #791018
Defendant: Robert Tinerella, Jared Buchin, Unknown Rose, Unknown Spitzley and Unknown Piggot
Case Number: 1:2017cv00797
Filed: August 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Ionia
Presiding Judge: Phillip J. Green
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Jonker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 76 ; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 56 is granted; the Court discerns no good faith basis for appeal ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 54 denying Motion to Seal; proposed order 55 is stricken; proposed sealed document 57 is unsealed; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 25 , 14 , 23 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee #791018 v. Tinerella et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lee #791018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tinerella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Buchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spitzley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Piggot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?