Cooper et al v. The 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Riggle, Samuel Colby, Beverly Zimmerman, Shannon Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Paul Groenendal, Rosalyn Ingham, Nancy James, Theodore James, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Terry Van Wuffen, Michelle Van Wuffen, Ronald Cooper, Mark Hill and Heidi Hill
Defendant: Waste Management, Inc., The 3M Company, Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Waste Management of Michigan, Inc. and Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Co
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Interested Party: William J. Mitchell
Claimant: Charles E. Brickey and Arthur C. Spalding
Case Number: 1:2017cv01062
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Ellen S Carmody
2 Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
3 Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 343 JOINT MOTION for order to modify the schedule in the first amended case management order by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.; (Daneker, Michael)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 342 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding Defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Expert Report of Elizabeth Anderson, PH.D., and Portions of an Exhibit to its Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #338 : motion hearing is set for 10/7/2021 at 11:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; video connection information #310 will remain the same; public audio access (listen only) available upon request (jal)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 341 PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT 37 - Excerpt of Deposition of Therese Cooper by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. re Brief in Support of a Motion, #339 (Daneker, Michael)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 340 PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT (Sealed Expert Report of Elizabeth Anderson, Ph.D.) by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. re Brief in Support of a Motion, #339 (Daneker, Michael)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Expert Report of Elizabeth Anderson, Ph.D., and Portions of an Exhibit to Its Brief in Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) #338 filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Daneker, Michael)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Expert Report of Elizabeth Anderson, Ph.D., and Portions of an Exhibit to Its Brief in Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Daneker, Michael)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Expert Report of Elizabeth Anderson, Ph.D., and Portions of an Exhibit to Its Brief in Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) #338 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding Defendant 3M Company's Motion to File Under Seal Expert Reports Supporting its Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification #328 and Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and a Supporting Exhibit #333 : motion hearing is set for 10/7/2021 at 11:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; video connection information #310 will remain the same; public audio access (listen only) available upon request (jal)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Defendant 3M Company's Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and a Supporting Exhibit) #333 , MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Motion to File Under Seal Expert Reports Supporting Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) #328 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 336 PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT 41 by defendant The 3M Company re Sealed Response to Motion #335 (Callaghan, Joseph)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 PROPOSED SEALED RESPONSE by defendant The 3M Company to MOTION to certify class and appointment of class representatives and lead counsel #291 (Ring, Daniel)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Defendant 3M Company's Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and a Supporting Exhibit) #333 filed by The 3M Company (Callaghan, Joseph)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Defendant 3M Company's Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and a Supporting Exhibit) with certificate of motion concurrence by defendant The 3M Company; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Callaghan, Joseph) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (ems).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 332 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to certify class and appointment of class representatives and lead counsel #291 filed by The 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Responses to 3M Company's First Set Of Interrogatories (Apr. 16, 2021) (excerpt), #3 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Susan Beach (Aug. 28, 2019) (excerpt) (taken in In re Nylaan, No. 18-02079 (Kent Cnty. Cir. Ct.)), #4 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Therese Cooper (May 27, 2021) (excerpt), #5 Exhibit 4 - Deposition of John Giesy (Feb. 14, 2020) (excerpt) (taken in In re Nylaan), #6 Exhibit 5 - Deposition of Dennis Gregory (June 8, 2021) (excerpt), #7 Exhibit 6 - Deposition of Malia Gregory (July 26, 2021) (excerpt), #8 Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Megan Johns (July 22, 2021) (excerpt), #9 Exhibit 8 - Deposition of Shawn Kruse (Apr. 24, 2019) (excerpt) (taken in In re Nylaan), #10 Exhibit 9 - Deposition of Cheryl Oliver (Jan. 9, 2019) (excerpt) (taken in In re Nylaan), #11 Exhibit 10 - Deposition of Loretta Powers (Oct. 8, 2019) (excerpt) (taken in In re Nylaan, #12 Exhibit 11 - Deposition of Michelle Van Wuffen (July 16, 2021) (excerpt, #13 Exhibit 12 - Deposition of Terry Van Wuffen (July 15, 2021) (excerpt), #14 Exhibit 13 - Deposition of Karen Vorce (Sept. 10, 2019) (excerpt) (taken in In re Nylaan), #15 Exhibit 14 - Amended Complaint, Kapp v. Wolverine World Wide, Inc., No. 18-08616 (Kent Cnty. Cir. Ct. Apr. 18, 2019), #16 Exhibit 15 - Amended Complaint, Klekotka v. Wolverine World Wide, Inc., No. 2018-01864 (Kent Cnty. Cir. Ct. Sept. 26, 2018), #17 Exhibit 16 - Amended Complaint, Moen v. Wolverine World Wide, Inc., No. 2018-01837 (Kent Cnty. Cir. Ct. Sept. 26, 2018), #18 Exhibit 17 - Amended Complaint, Watts v. Wolverine World Wide, Inc., No. 17-10906 (Kent Cnty. Cir. Ct. Aug. 13, 2018) (excerpt), #19 Exhibit 18 - Order, McNaughton v. Wolverine World Wide, Inc., No. 18-00086 (Kent Cnty. Cir. Ct. Jan. 3, 2020), #20 Exhibit 19 - 3M FC-233A Material Safety Data Sheet (Feb. 1981) (3M_METZ00002527), #21 Exhibit 20 - 3M FC-236A Material Safety Data Sheet (Feb. 1981) (3M_NYLAAN02520914), #22 Exhibit 21 - 3M FC-236A Product Toxicity Summary Sheet (Aug. 1981) (3M_METZ00002145), #23 Exhibit 22 - 3M FC-905 Material Safety Data Sheet (Aug. 1982) (3M_METZ00002188), #24 Exhibit 23 - 3M FC-233A Material Safety Data Sheet (July 1984) (3M_METZ00002547), #25 Exhibit 24 - 3M FC-905 Material Safety Data Sheet (July 1984) (3M_METZ00002182), #26 Exhibit 25 - 3M FC-233A Material Safety Data Sheet (Nov. 1985) (3M_METZ00002541), #27 Exhibit 26 - 3M FC-905 Material Safety Data Sheet (Nov. 1985) (3M_METZ00002178), #28 Exhibit 27 - 3M FC-236A Product Environmental Data Sheet (Sept. 1988) (3M_NYLAAN00253974), #29 Exhibit 28 - 3M FX-3567 Material Safety Data Sheet (Dec. 1989) (3M_METZ00002579), #30 Exhibit 29 - 3M FX-3567 Technical Data Sheet (Feb. 1991) (3M_METZ00002198), #31 Exhibit 30 - 3M FC-228 Material Safety Data Sheet (Mar. 1992) (3M_METZ00001727), #32 Exhibit 31 - 3M FC-228 Material Safety Data Sheet (July 1992) (3M_METZ00001735), #33 Exhibit 32 - 3M FC-905 Material Safety Data Sheet (Jan. 1993) (3M_METZ00001489), #34 Exhibit 33 - 3M FC-228 Material Safety Data Sheet (Sept. 1998) (3M_METZ00001764), #35 Exhibit 34 - 3M FC-905 Material Safety Data Sheet (Sept. 1998) (3M_METZ00001506), #36 Exhibit 35 - 3M FX-3567 Material Safety Data Sheet (Sept. 1998) (3M_METZ00001574), #37 Exhibit 36 - 3M Press Release, 3M Phasing Out Some Of Its Specialty Materials (May 16, 2000) (3M_NYLAAN00043194), #38 Exhibit 37 - About Us, Wolverine Leathers (webpage excerpt) (Plaintiffs 000024493), #39 Exhibit 38 - F. A. Ubel & D. E. Roach, Health Status Of Plant Workers Exposed To Fluorochemicals - A Preliminary Report, 41 Am. Indus. Hygiene Ass'n J. 584 (1980), #40 Exhibit 39 - F. D. Griffith & J. E. Long, Animal Toxicity Studies With Ammonium Perfluorooctanoate, 41 Am. Indus. Hygiene Ass'n J. 576 (1980), #41 Exhibit 40 - W. S. Guy et al., Organic Fluorocompounds In Human Plasma: Prevalence And Characterization, in Biochemistry Involving Carbon-Fluorine Bonds (R. Filler ed. 1976), #42 REDACTED Exhibit 41 - Filed Under Seal - Protective Chemical Product Patent / Product Correlation (May 6, 1994) (3M_NYLAAN02629242)) (Ring, Daniel)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 331 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to certify class and appointment of class representatives and lead counsel #291 filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Class Issues Chart, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2012 Letter from DEQ to EPA (WWWNylaan0526243), #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of Dep. of Robert Winegar (Nov. 9, 2018), #4 Exhibit 4 - 1955 Rep. on Wolverine's Treatment Plant (WWWNylaan0538209), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of Oct. 30, 2018 Dep. of Harold Bailey, #6 Exhibit 6 - 1979 Letter from Wolverine to EPA (WWWNylaan0536969), #7 Exhibit 7 - 1977 Letter from KCHD to Wolverine (WWWNylaan0029176), #8 Exhibit 8 - 1966 Letter from Wolverine to Michigan Department of Public Health (WWWNylaan0077483), #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpt of Mar. 30, 2004 Dep. of H. Bailey, #10 Exhibit 10 - EGLE's Dec. 2018 Geologic Review, #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpt of May 9, 2019 Dep. of Abigail Hendershott, #12 Exhibit 12 - Excerpt of Dep. of Mark Worrall (Sep. 19, 2019), #13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpt of May 7, 2019 Dep. of A. Hendershott, #14 Exhibit 14 - Excerpt of Oct. 12, 2020 Dep. of A. Hendershott, #15 Exhibit 15 - EPA's Jan. 2009 Provisional Health Advisories for PFOA and PFOS, #16 Exhibit 16 - EPA's Nov. 2016 Fact Sheet, #17 Exhibit 17 - EPA's Website concerning "Emerging Contaminants", #18 Exhibit 18 - EGLE's Jan. 2018 Cleanup Criteria Bulletin, #19 Exhibit 19 - EGLE's Aug. 2020 Announcement re: PFAS Drinking Water Advisories, #20 Exhibit 20 - Rose & Westra Memo to EGLE, #21 Exhibit 21 - 1/21/2020 Op. and Or., #22 Exhibit 22 - Excerpt of Dep. of Karen Vorce (Sep. 10, 2019), #23 Exhibit 23 - Excerpt of Dep. of Loretta Powers (Oct. 8, 2019), #24 Exhibit 24 - 1965 Letter from KCHD to Wolverine (WWWNylaan0077502), #25 Exhibit 25 - 1/10/2020 Op. and Or., #26 Exhibit 26 - 1/25/2021 Op. and Or., #27 Exhibit 27 - Excerpt of Dep. of Matthew Kepley (Nov. 9, 2020), #28 Exhibit 28 - Excerpt of Dep. of Lisa VanderLoo (Nov. 9, 2020), #29 Exhibit 29 - Excerpt of Dep. of Kevin Lee (Jun. 3, 2021), #30 Exhibit 30 - Excerpt of Dep. of Tyler Hansen (Jun. 3, 2021), #31 Exhibit 31 - Excerpt of Dep. of Jason Carpenter (May 12, 2021), #32 Exhibit 32 - Excerpt of Dep. of Lu Anne Baar (Jun. 3, 2021), #33 Exhibit 33 - Excerpt of Dep. of Jason Rosenzweig (Jun. 22, 2021), #34 Exhibit 34 - Excerpt of Dep. of Jeffrey Miller (Aug. 3, 2021), #35 Exhibit 35 - 8/23/2021 Op. and Or., #36 Exhibit 36 - Excerpt of Dep. of Dennis Gregory (Jun. 28, 2021), #37 Exhibit 37 - Excerpt of Dep. of Therese Cooper (May 27, 2021), #38 Exhibit 38 - Excerpt of Dep. of Terry VanWuffen (Jul. 15, 2021), #39 Exhibit 39 - Excerpt of Dep. of Michelle VanWuffen (Jul. 16, 2021), #40 Exhibit 40 - Excerpt of Dep. of Michael Johns (Jul. 23, 2021), #41 Exhibit 41 - Excerpt of Dep. of Megan Johns (Jul. 22, 2021), #42 Exhibit 42 - Excerpt of Dep. of Malia Gregory (Jul. 26, 2021), #43 Exhibit 43 - 4/25/2018 Sched. Or., #44 Exhibit 44 - 12/6/2019 Op. and Or., #45 Exhibit 45 - 1/17/2020 Op. and Or., #46 Exhibit 46 - 4/7/2021 Am. Sched. Or., #47 Exhibit 47 - Pfs.' Responses to 3M Company's First Set of Interrogatories, No. 15) (Daneker, Michael)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 330 PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT (Defendant's Sealed Expert Reports Supporting Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) by defendant The 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Beck Report Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Beck Report Part 2, #3 Exhibit B - Herzstein Report, #4 Exhibit C - JLL Report - Part 1, #5 Exhibit C - JLL Report - Part 2, #6 Exhibit C - JLL Report - Part 3, #7 Exhibit C - JLL Report - Part 4, #8 Exhibit D - Sharma Report - Part 1, #9 Exhibit D - Sharma Report - Part 2, #10 Exhibit D - Sharma Report - Part 3, #11 Exhibit E - Wait Report) (Callaghan, Joseph)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 329 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Motion to File Under Seal Expert Reports Supporting Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) #328 filed by The 3M Company (Callaghan, Joseph)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Motion to File Under Seal Expert Reports Supporting Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) with certificate of motion concurrence by defendant The 3M Company; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Callaghan, Joseph) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (ems).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 327 EXPERT REPORT of Elizabeth Anderson, Ph.D., A.T.S. Fellow submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Daneker, Michael)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 326 EXPERT REPORT of Trevor Phillips, FRICS, ASA, CCIM, CRE submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Daneker, Michael)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 325 EXPERT REPORT of Kurt Herman submitted for filing by defendant The 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Expert Report of Kurt Herman) (Callaghan, Joseph)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 324 CORRECTED EXPERT REPORT of Tim Verslycke submitted for filing by defendant The 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Corrected Expert Report of Tim Verslycke) (Callaghan, Joseph) Modified text on 9/27/2021; this entry replaces #320 (ems).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 323 EXPERT REPORT of David Woodward submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of David Woodward, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exhibits to Sections 3, 6, and 7 of Expert Report of D. Woodward, #3 Exhibit 3 - Exhibits to Sections 9.1-9.10 of Expert Rep. of D. Woodward, #4 Exhibit 4 - Exhibits to Sections 9.11-9. 27 of Expert Rep. of D. Woodward, #5 Exhibit 5 - Exhibits to Sections 10 and 12 of Expert Rep. of D. Woodward, #6 Exhibit 6 - App. A to Expert Rep. of D. Woodward, #7 Exhibit 7 - App. B (Offsite Study, Body) of Expert Report of D. Woodward, #8 Exhibit 8 - App. B (Offsite Study, Exhibits 1-6) to Expert Rep. of D. Woodward, #9 Exhibit 9 - App. B (Offsite Study, Exhibit 7) to Expert Rep. of D. Woodward, #10 Exhibit 10 - App. B (Offsite Study, Exhibits 8-19) to Expert Rep. of D. Woodward, #11 Exhibit 11 - App. B (Offsite Study, Exhibits 20-29) to Expert Rep. of D. Woodward, #12 Exhibit 12 - App. B (Offsite Study, Exhibits 30-39) to Expert Rep. of D. Woodward, #13 Exhibit 13 - App. B (Offsite Study, Exhibits 40-App. A) to Expert Rep. of D. Woodward, #14 Exhibit 14 - App. C to Expert Rep. of D. Woodward) (Daneker, Michael)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 322 EXPERT REPORT of Denese A. Deeds submitted for filing by defendant The 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Expert Report of Denese A. Deeds) (Callaghan, Joseph)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 321 EXPERT REPORT of Maureen T.F. Reitman submitted for filing by defendant The 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Expert Report of Maureen T.F. Reitman, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C) (Callaghan, Joseph)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 320 EXPERT REPORT of Tim Verslycke submitted for filing by defendant The 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Expert Report of Tim Verslycke) (Callaghan, Joseph)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 319 EXPERT REPORT of Dominik D. Alexander submitted for filing by defendant The 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Expert Report of Dominik D. Alexander) (Callaghan, Joseph)
September 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 318 EXPERT REPORT of Linda Dell submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Daneker, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 317 EXPERT REPORT of Jeffrey Genzink, MAI (VanWuffen Property) submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Daneker, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 316 EXPERT REPORT of Jeffrey Genzink, MAI (Cooper Property) submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Daneker, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 315 EXPERT REPORT of Charles E. Finch, CVA submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Daneker, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 314 EXPERT REPORT of Jeffrey Genzink, MAI (Johns Property) submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Daneker, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 313 EXPERT REPORT of Jeffrey Genzink, MAI (Gregory Property) submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Daneker, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 312 EXPERT REPORT of Marcia Williams submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Daneker, Michael)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 311 EXPERT REPORT of Allen Reilly submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Daneker, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua Yount on behalf of defendant The 3M Company (Yount, Joshua)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 310 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Video conference information for 10/7/2021 hearing [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, The 3M Company, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Wolverine World Wide, Inc. only] (jal)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding Plaintiffs' Motion and Supplemental Motion to File Portions of Their Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto Under Seal #275 and #286 ; motion hearing is set for 10/7/2021 at 11:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; (jal)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 308 JOINT RESPONSE TO MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion to File Portions of their Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto Under Seal) #286 , MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT - Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto #275 filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Daneker, Michael) Modified text on 9/16/2021 (ems).
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 307 RESPONSE TO MOTION for leave to file amended complaint #297 (Defendants' Joint Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Complaint) filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Daneker, Michael) Modified text on 9/13/2021 (ems).
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 306 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition, #305 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Almonrode, Sharon)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to strike #291 , #294 EMERGENCY MOTION to stay re #291 , #294 #300 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Almonrode, Sharon)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER requiring Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion and/or Supplemental Motion to File Portions of their Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached thereto under Seal #275 and #286 by 9/15/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER requiring Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' motion #300 within seven (7) days; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tmb)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE re #300 of Joinder in (1) Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; (2) Response to Motion to Amend the Complaint; and (3) Expedited Motion to Stay by defendant The 3M Company (Ring, Daniel) Modified text on 9/3/2021 (ems).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 301 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to strike #291 , #294 EMERGENCY MOTION to stay re #291 , #294 #300 filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Daneker, Michael)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MOTION to strike #291 , #294 , EMERGENCY MOTION to stay re #291 , #294 , RESPONSE TO MOTION for leave to file amended complaint #297 by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.; (Daneker, Michael) Modified text on 9/3/2021 (ems).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 299 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION for leave to file amended complaint #297 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 9/2/2021 (ems).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 298 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file amended complaint #297 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 9/2/2021 (ems).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MOTION for leave to file amended complaint by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Plaintiffs' Declarations, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Third Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Third Amended Complaint with redline comparison) (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 9/2/2021 (ems).
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 296 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to certify class and appointment of class representatives and lead counsel #291 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 295 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to certify class and appointment of class representatives and lead counsel #291 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 PROPOSED SEALED MOTION for class certification and appointment of class representation and lead counsel by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit F - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit G - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit H - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit I - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit K - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit R - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit T - Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit V - Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit W - Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit Z - Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit DD - Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit EE - Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit JJ - Filed Under Seal, #15 Exhibit SS - filed under seal part 1, #16 Exhibit SS - filed under seal part 2, #17 Exhibit VV - filed under seal) (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 EXHIBITS re #291 by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J - Dr. Hugh Dryce Statement, #2 Exhibit K - filed under seal, #3 Exhibit L - 3M Waste Disposal Investigation, #4 Exhibit M - Weppner dep ex 752, #5 Exhibit N - Weppner dep ex 754, #6 Exhibit O - Weppner dep ex 761, #7 Exhibit P - Weppner dep ex 763, #8 Exhibit Q - Weppner Dep ex 764, #9 Exhibit R - Filed under seal, #10 Exhibit S - Zobel dep ex 533, #11 Exhibit T - filed under seal, #12 Exhibit U - Weppner dep ex 793, #13 Exhibit V - filed under seal, #14 Exhibit W - filed under seal, #15 Exhibit X - Weppner dep ex 786, #16 Exhibit Y - 3M letter, #17 Exhibit Z - filed under seal, #18 Exhibit AA - 3M letter, #19 Exhibit BB - EPA phaseout news release, #20 Exhibit CC - 3M Letter, #21 Exhibit DD - filed under seal, #22 Exhibit EE - filed under seal, #23 Exhibit FF - draft agreement of sale, #24 Exhibit GG - filed under seal, #25 Exhibit HH - O'Donnell ex 0286, #26 Exhibit II - MDEQ email, #27 Exhibit JJ - filed under seal, #28 Exhibit KK - Krueger dep ex 1921, #29 Exhibit LL - MLive article, #30 Exhibit MM - Giesy dep ex 1950, #31 Exhibit NN - Hufnagel dep ex 0207, #32 Exhibit OO - Dr Anderson Blog, #33 Exhibit PP - Email, #34 Exhibit QQ - Simmonds dep trans, #35 Exhibit RR - NDCEA participant demographics, #36 Exhibit SS - filed under seal, #37 Exhibit TT - Declaration of Sharon Almonrode and resume, #38 Exhibit UU - Declaration of Esther Berezofsky and resume, #39 Exhibit VV - filed under seal) (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 8/31/2021 (ems).
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion to File Portions of their Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto Under Seal) #286 , MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT - Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto #275 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 292 EXHIBITS re #291 by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class definition, #2 Exhibit B - Devarenne Dep ex 34, #3 Exhibit C - Devarenne dep ex 35, #4 Exhibit D - Zobel dep trans, #5 Exhibit E - Newmark dep trans, #6 Exhibit F - filed under seal, #7 Exhibit G - filed under seal, #8 Exhibit H - filed under seal, #9 Exhibit I - filed under seal) (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 8/31/2021 (ems).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MOTION to certify class and appointment of class representatives and lead counsel by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen; (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 290 (DENIED per Order #478 ) PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Attachments: #1 SEALED EXHIBIT 26 - Giesy Deposition EX 1941, #2 SEALED EXHIBIT 27 - Giesy Deposition EX 1943, #3 SEALED EXHIBIT 28 - O'Donnell Deposition EX 288, #4 SEALED EXHIBIT 29 - Barrette Deposition EX 156) (Antullis, Dorothy) Modified text on 11/30/2021 (mlc).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 289 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, #287 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Antullis, Dorothy)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 288 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion to File Portions of their Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto Under Seal) #286 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Antullis, Dorothy) Modified text on 8/31/2021 (ems).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 287 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion to File Portions of their Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto Under Seal) #286 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Antullis, Dorothy) Modified text on 8/31/2021 (ems).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT (Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion to File Portions of their Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto Under Seal) by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Antullis, Dorothy) Modified text and filers on 8/31/2021 (ems).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 EXPERT REPORT of Robert A. Simons, Ph.D. submitted for filing by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Robert A. Simons, Ph.D.) (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 284 EXPERT REPORT of Donald I. Siegel, Ph.D. submitted for filing by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Donald I. Siegel, Ph.D.) (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 283 EXPERT REPORT of Philippe Grandjean, MD, DMSc submitted for filing by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Philippe Grandjean, MD, DMSc) (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 282 EXPERT REPORT of Alan Ducatman, MD, MS submitted for filing by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Alan Ducatman, MD, MS) (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 281 EXPERT REPORT of Jamie C. Dewitt, Ph.D. submitted for filing by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Jamie C. Dewitt, Ph.D.) (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 280 EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Kirk W. Brown submitted for filing by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Dr. Kirk W. Brown) (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 (DENIED per Order #478 ) PROPOSED SEALED EXHIBIT to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Attachments: #1 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 - Earl Tefft Deposition Transcript, #2 SEALED EXHIBIT 2- Leo Devarenne Deposition Transcript, #3 SEALED EXHIBIT 3- Cheryl Oliver Deposition Transcript, #4 SEALED EXHIBIT 4 - Joseph Azzarello Deposition Transcript, #5 SEALED EXHIBIT 5 - EX 0027 Janice Barnes Deposition Exhibit, #6 SEALED EXHIBIT 6 - EX 0759 William A. Weppner Deposition Exhibit, #7 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 - EX 0762 William A. Weppner Deposition Exhibit, #8 SEALED EXHIBIT 8 - Record of Telephone Conversation w Dr. Guy 8.20.1975, #9 SEALED EXHIBIT 9 - EX 1190 Susan Beach Deposition Exhibit, #10 SEALED EXHIBIT 10 - Dale Bacon Deposition Transcript, #11 SEALED EXHIBIT 11 - Rich Purdy Resignation Email 3.28.1999, #12 SEALED EXHIBIT 12 - WWW Email to 3M 5.31.2000, #13 SEALED EXHIBIT 13 - 5.22.2000 Letter to 3M, #14 SEALED EXHIBIT 14 - Janice Barnes Deposition Transcript, #15 SEALED EXHIBIT 15 - EX 2003 Abigail Hendershott 10.12.2020, #16 SEALED EXHIBIT 16 - Blood Serum Results of Malia Gregory 07.10.2019, #17 SEALED EXHIBIT 17 - Blood Serum Results of Dennis Gregory 07.10.2019, #18 SEALED EXHIBIT 18 - EX 23 Malia Gregory 07.26.2021, #19 SEALED EXHIBIT 19 - EX 24 Malia Gregory 07.26.2021, #20 SEALED EXHIBIT 20 - Blood Serum Results of Megan Johns 08.01.2019, #21 SEALED EXHIBIT 21 - Blood Serum Results of Michael Johns 08.01.2019, #22 SEALED EXHIBIT 22 - Blood Serum Results of Terry Vanwuffen 06.11.2019, #23 SEALED EXHIBIT 23 - Blood Serum Results of Terry Vanwuffen 06.11.2019, #24 SEALED EXHIBIT 24 - Blood Serum Results of Michelle Vanwuffen 06.11.2019, #25 SEALED EXHIBIT 25 - Blood Serum Results of Michelle Vanwuffen 06.11.2019) (Antullis, Dorothy) Modified text on 11/30/2021 (mlc).
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 278 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, #276 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Antullis, Dorothy)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 277 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT - Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto #275 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Antullis, Dorothy)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT - Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto #275 filed by Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Antullis, Dorothy)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT - Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Certain Exhibits Attached Thereto by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Antullis, Dorothy)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting in part and denying in part STIPULATION #273 ; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tmb)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Permitting Plaintiffs and Defendants to File Their Respective Class Certification Briefs in Excess of the Word Count Limit Dictated by Local Civil Rules 7.2(b)(i) and 7.2(c), And to File Exhibits and Attachments Thereto in Excess of the Limit Dictated by Local Civil Rule 7.1(b) by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen [Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis added to party Therese Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis added to party Dennis Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis added to party Malia Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis added to party Mark Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis added to party Heidi Hill (pty:pla), Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis added to party Megan Johns(pty:pla), Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis added to party Michael Johns(pty:pla), Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis added to party Michelle Van Wuffen(pty:pla), Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis added to party Terry Van Wuffen(pty:pla)] (Antullis, Dorothy)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting in part and denying in part STIPULATION #271 ; Plaintiff's motion for class certification due 8/30/21; Defendant's response due 9/27/21; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadlines to File Motion for Class Certification and Expert Reports by plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 270 LETTER from attorney Madelaine C. Lane for defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. regarding screening procedures-Larry Murphy (Lane, Madelaine)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Daneker, Michael)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting STIPULATION #267 dismissing plaintiff Beverly Zimmerman without prejudice; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Named Plaintiff Beverly Zimmerman by plaintiff Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Emily Hughes on behalf of plaintiffs Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Hughes, Emily)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, #197 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by The 3M Company (Ring, Daniel)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,, #197 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Daneker, Michael)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Named Plaintiffs Mark Hill and Heidi Hill Without Prejudice filed by plaintiffs Mark Hill, Heidi Hill (Berezofsky, Esther)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Plaintiff Ronald Cooper filed by plaintiff Ronald Cooper (Almonrode, Sharon)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #208 #210 motions to dismiss; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 OPINION; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting motion #253 : discovery to be completed by 10/6/2021; dispositive motions due by 11/18/2021; settlement conference set for 2/17/2022 at 2:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 3/24/2022 at 11:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; jury trial set for 4/18/2022 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MINUTES of motion hearing re #253 MOTION for order To Modify the December 22, 2020 Scheduling Order filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. held before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (Court Reporter: Genevieve Hamlin) (haw)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response to Motion, #257 filed by Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 RESPONSE TO MOTION for order To Modify the December 22, 2020 Scheduling Order #253 filed by Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Email dated April 15, 2021, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter dated May 19, 2021) (Almonrode, Sharon)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE re #253 of Joinder in Motion to Modify the December 22, 2020 Scheduling Order by defendant The 3M Company (Ring, Daniel)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER re MOTION for order To Modify the December 22, 2020 Scheduling Order #253 : motion hearing set for 5/27/2021 at 11:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Order #253 filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Daneker, Michael)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION for order To Modify the December 22, 2020 Scheduling Order by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.; (Daneker, Michael)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alana A. Karbal on behalf of plaintiffs Megan Johns, Michael Johns (Karbal, Alana)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sarah T. Hansel on behalf of plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Debra Hilton, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Hansel, Sarah)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT of the hearing held Thursday, April 22, 2021 before Hon. Sally J. Berens, Magistrate Judge; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 8/9/2021 ; redaction request due 6/1/2021 (Transcriptionist: Rozema, Bonnie L.) Modified text on 5/10/2021 (eod) Modified link on 8/5/2021; this entry replaces Transcript #251 (ems).
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 (DISREGARD) TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held Thursday, April 22, 2021 before Hon. Sally J. Berens, Magistrate Judge; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 8/5/2021 ; redaction request due 5/28/2021 (Transcriptionist: Rozema, Bonnie L.) Modified text on 5/10/2021; replaced by #252 (eod)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER denying as moot #237 Defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTES of motion hearing re #237 MOTION to compel filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. held by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; motion denied as moot (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (jln)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 JOINT WITHDRAWAL by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman of JOINT MOTION to amend/correct Case Management Order #244 filed by Heidi Hill, Therese Cooper, Malia Gregory, Dennis Gregory, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Mark Hill, Ronald Cooper, Beverly Zimmerman, Michael Johns, Megan Johns (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 4/15/2021 (eod)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response to Motion, #246 filed by Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 4/8/2021 (eod)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 RESPONSE TO MOTION to compel #237 filed by Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- 3/23/2021 Email from S. Weirick to E. Hughes, et al., #3 Exhibit 2- 3/19/2021 Letter from S. Almonrode to S. Weirick, #4 Exhibit 3- 3/17/2021 Emails from E. Hughes to S. Weirick, #5 Exhibit 4- 3/30/2021 Email from E. Hughes to S. Weirick, et al., #6 Exhibit 5- 4/2/2021 Email from S. Weirick to E. Berezofsky, et al., #7 Exhibit 6- Unpublished cases) (Almonrode, Sharon)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re JOINT MOTION to amend/correct Case Management Order #244 filed by Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 JOINT MOTION to amend/correct Case Management Order by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman; with memorandum of law in support (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 4/8/2021 (eod)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery by plaintiffs (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 3/31/2021 (eod)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Stipulated Order Extending Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery by plaintiff Beverly Zimmerman #242 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding Defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery #237 : motion hearing is set for 4/22/2021 at 11:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; Zoom connection information will be sent to the attorneys before the hearing; Public access information for this proceeding is available upon request to chambers; RECORDING OR BROADCASTING OF THIS PROCEEDING IS PROHIBITED LGenR 4.1(c)(i) and (ii) (jln)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE to attorney Michael D. Daneker regarding recent filing #239 (eod)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 EXHIBIT 1 (Plaintiff's Responses) re #238 Brief in support of Motion #237 by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 Letter Summary, #2 Exhibit 3 Plaintiff's Objections and Responses) (Daneker, Michael) Modified text on 3/22/2021 (eod)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to compel #237 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 BRIEF in support of MOTION to compel #237 filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Daneker, Michael)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MOTION to compel by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certification of Conferral) (Daneker, Michael)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting motion to withdraw #233 ; Jason Alperstein is withdrawn from representing plaintiffs in this matter; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #230 motion to appoint counsel; Dorothy P. Antullis is appointed to the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in the place of Jason Alperstein; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to withdraw Jason H. Alperstein as counsel of record for plaintiffs and removal from court's ECF notification system #233 filed by Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 3/4/2021 (eod)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for leave to withdraw Jason H. Alperstein as counsel of record for plaintiffs and removal from court's ECF notification system with brief in support by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order) (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 3/4/2021 (eod)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to appoint substitute steering committee member #230 filed by Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 3/4/2021 (eod)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint substitute steering committee member #230 filed by Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 3/4/2021 (eod)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MOTION to appoint substitute steering committee member with brief in support by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dory Antillus Resume) (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 3/4/2021 (eod)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REPLY to response to motion #210 filed by The 3M Company (Ring, Daniel) Modified text on 2/23/2021 (eod) Modified text on 2/24/2021 (eod)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 REPLY to response to MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #208 filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Daneker, Michael) Modified text on 2/23/2021 (eod) Modified text on 2/24/2021 (eod)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas David Hoyle on behalf of plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Hoyle, Thomas)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition, #226 filed by Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 2/19/2021 (eod)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss and Alternative Motion to Strike #210 , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #208 filed by Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Veolia Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - McNaughton, et. al. v. Wolverine World Wide, Inc) (Almonrode, Sharon)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting PROPOSED ORDER #223 ; plaintiffs shall file omnibus response to defendants' motions to dismiss; defendants shall file omnibus reply; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Hon. Gerald E. Rosen ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 2/11/2021 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 2/11/2021 (lep)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator #224 sent via email to Hon. Gerald E. Rosen (lep)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 PROPOSED ORDER regarding stipulated order permitting plaintiffs to file an omnibus response to defendants' motions to dismiss and permitting defendants to file an omnibus reply by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 2/4/2021 (eod)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting motion for order #220 ; Judge Gerald Rosen is appointed as mediator; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 BRIEF in support of JOINT MOTION for order to Appoint Facilitative Mediator #220 with certificate of service filed by Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 2/3/2021 (eod)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 JOINT MOTION for order to Appoint Facilitative Mediator with certificate of service by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman; (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 2/3/2021 (eod)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 LETTER from attorney Esther E. Berezofsky for plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman regarding Mediation [Attorney Esther E. Berezofsky added to party Megan Johns(pty:pla), Attorney Esther E. Berezofsky added to party Michael Johns(pty:pla)] (Berezofsky, Esther)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting stipulation regarding Document Production and Discovery Order #215 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting stipulation governing confidential material #214 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln) Modified text on 2/1/2021 (jln).
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting Stipulation and Joint Order regarding protocol governing discovery of electronically stored information #213 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED ORDER regarding Stipulated Document Production and Discovery Order #215 ; PROPOSED ORDER regarding Stipulated Joint Protocol Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information #213 ; PROPOSED ORDER regarding Stipulated Protective Order Governing Confidential Material #214 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PROPOSED AND STIPULATED ORDER regarding Document Production and Discovery Order by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 1/26/2021 (eod)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PROPOSED AND STIPULATED ORDER regarding protective order governing confidential material with attachments A-1, A-2, B, and C by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 1/26/2021 (eod)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND JOINT ORDER regarding protocol governing discovery of electronically stored information by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 1/26/2021 (eod)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER of referral to voluntary facilitative mediation; amending case management order #207 ; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss #210 with certificate of compliance filed by The 3M Company (Ring, Daniel) Modified text on 1/19/2021 (eod)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION to dismiss and Alternative Motion to Strike by defendant The 3M Company; (Ring, Daniel)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim #208 with certificate of compliance filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Daneker, Michael) Modified text on 1/19/2021 (eod)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.; (Daneker, Michael)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jason J. Thompson on behalf of plaintiffs Megan Johns, Michael Johns (Thompson, Jason)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 7/8/2021; dispositive motions due by 8/20/2021; settlement conference set for 11/4/2021 at 2:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 12/22/2021 at 1:00 PM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; jury trial set for 1/24/2022 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Stipulated Case Management Order by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER: answers to the second amended complaint or motions to dismiss are to be filed by January 11, 2021; the parties are to meet and confer regarding case management deadlines and provide same to the Court no later than 12:00 p.m., December 18, 2020; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MINUTES of status conference held before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (Court Reporter: Melinda Dexter) (haw)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Azzi, Robert)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE of status conference set for 12/10/2020 at 2:30 PM at by telephone before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; (haw)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael D. Daneker on behalf of defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Daneker, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071; Judge Janet T. Neff is no longer assigned to the case (jem)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kara A. Elgersma on behalf of plaintiffs Megan Johns, Michael Johns (Elgersma, Kara)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 SUPPLEMENT re Supplement, #192 Second Supplement to Joint Notice by plaintiffs Ronald Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER GRANTING Motion for the Appointment of Interim class Counsel #166 ; Joint Notice due not later than June 18, 2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against The 3M Company, Wolverine World Wide, Inc. filed by Therese Cooper, Debra Hilton, Heidi Hill, Mark Hill, Samuel Colby, Dennis Gregory, Beverly Zimmerman, Terry Van Wuffen, Ron Cooper, Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Malia Gregory, Michelle Van Wuffen, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (ns) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (ns).
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #195 motion for order in case 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB; granting #73 motion for order in case 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB; granting #122 motion for order in case 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB; the Clerk shall accept for filing and docket Plaintiffs' proposed Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint [195-1], which maintains Beverly Zimmerman as a party plaintiff, and the Henry and Johns cases shall be administratively closed; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MOTION for order Granting Plaintiffs Leave to File Second Amended Consolidated Complaint to Add Beverly Zimmerman as a Party Plaintiff and Administratively Closing the Johns and Henry Actions by plaintiffs Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Megan Johns, Michael Johns; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Second Amended Consolidated Complaint); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting (186) motion for reconsideration in case 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB; granting (64) motion for reconsideration in case 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB; granting (113) motion for reconsideration in case 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB; filing due not later than May 20, 2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 RESPONSE TO MOTION for reconsideration and/or Clarification of the Court's March 16, 2020 Order (Dkt. 181)(186 in 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 64 in 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 113 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB) filed by Wolverine World Wide Inc., The 3M Company ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Azzi, Robert)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 SUPPLEMENT re Notice (Other),, (180 in 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 58 in 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 107 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB) Supplement to Joint Notice by plaintiffs Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Megan Johns, Michael Johns ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting motion to stay portion of the order (189) in case 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB; (67) in case 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB; (116) in case 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB; Defendants may file a response to the motion for reconsideration and/or clarification not later than 5/10/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to stay Portion of the Court's March 16, 2020 Order (Dkt. 181) Requiring Plaintiffs to File Voluntary Dismissals of Zimmerman and Henry Actions and Proceed with Johns Action Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsidera(189 in 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 67 in 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 116 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB) filed by Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Megan Johns, Michael Johns; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION to stay Portion of the Court's March 16, 2020 Order (Dkt. 181) Requiring Plaintiffs to File Voluntary Dismissals of Zimmerman and Henry Actions and Proceed with Johns Action Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration and/or Clarification (Dkt. 186) by plaintiffs Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Megan Johns, Michael Johns; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Unpublished Decisions); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION for reconsideration and/or Clarification of the Court's March 16, 2020 Order (Dkt. 181)(186 in 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 64 in 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 113 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB) filed by Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Megan Johns, Michael Johns; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for reconsideration and/or Clarification of the Court's March 16, 2020 Order (Dkt. 181)(186 in 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 64 in 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 113 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB) filed by Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Megan Johns, Michael Johns; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION for reconsideration and/or Clarification of the Court's March 16, 2020 Order (Dkt. 181) by plaintiffs Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Megan Johns, Michael Johns; (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A-In re Flint Water Cases, No. 5:16-cv-10444, #3 Exhibit B-Unpublished Decisions); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting renewed stipulated proposed order extending certain deadlines (184) in case 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB; (62) in case 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB; (111) in case 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Renewed Stipulation and Order to Extend Deadlines Included in the Court's March 26, 2020 Order by plaintiffs Susan Henry, Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman, Danielle Galloway, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Jeff Steendam, Quinn Steendam, Ilze Sandra Stults, Adam Trompen ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER denying without prejudice stipulated proposed order (182) in case 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB; (60) in case 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB; (109) in case 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend the Deadlines Included in the Court's March 16, 2020 Order by plaintiffs Susan Henry, Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman, Danielle Galloway, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Jeff Steendam, Quinn Steendam, Ilze Sandra Stults, Adam Trompen ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #176 motion to amend/correct in case 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB; granting in part and denying in part #54 motion to amend/correct in case 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB; granting in part and denying in part #103 motion to amend/correct in case 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE - Joint Notice by plaintiffs Susan Henry, Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman, Danielle Galloway, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Jeff Steendam, Quinn Steendam, Ilze Sandra Stults, Adam Trompen ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Berezofsky, Esther)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 RESPONSE TO MOTION to amend/correct Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Caption for Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint(103 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB) filed by Wolverine World Wide Inc., Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Ramsey, Janet)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph Callaghan on behalf of defendant The 3M Company ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Callaghan, Joseph)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 PROPOSED ORDER regarding to Amend Caption for Amended Consolidated Action by plaintiffs Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Megan Johns, Michael Johns ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to amend/correct Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Caption for Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint(103 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB) filed by Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Megan Johns, Michael Johns; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION to amend/correct Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Caption for Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by plaintiffs Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Megan Johns, Michael Johns; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Order to Amend Caption); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting STIPULATION (174) in case 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB; granting STIPULATION (52) in case 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB; granting STIPULATION (101) in case 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend the Time for Plaintiffs to File a Stipulation Amending the Case Caption and Ensuring Appropriate Appearances are Filed by plaintiffs Susan Henry, Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman, Danielle Galloway, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Jeff Steendam, Quinn Steendam, Ilze Sandra Stults, Adam Trompen ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT of Pre-Motion Conference held 01/31/2020 before Honorable Janet Neff; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 5/11/2020 ; redaction request due 3/2/2020 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Brandell, Paul (517) 230-7507)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE of Request for Removal from ECF Notifications by defendants Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Ferroli, John)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE ORDER; motions to dismiss #155 #157 are DENIED without prejudice; amendment of captions due not later than February 10, 2020; Joint Notice due not later than March 6, 2020; Motion for appointment of interim class counsel #44 is taken under advisement; responsive pleadings/answers due 21 days after the Joint Notice; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTES of pre-motion conference re (84 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB, 157 in 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 34 in 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB), (82 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB, 155 in 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 32 in 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB) held before Judge Janet T. Neff (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion,,,, (94 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB) filed by Susan Henry, Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman, Danielle Galloway, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Jeff Steendam, Quinn Steendam, Ilze Sandra Stults, Adam Trompen; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to appoint counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel(93 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB) filed by Susan Henry, Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman, Danielle Galloway, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Jeff Steendam, Quinn Steendam, Ilze Sandra Stults, Adam Trompen; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 BRIEF in support of MOTION to appoint counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel(93 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB) filed by Susan Henry, Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman, Danielle Galloway, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Jeff Steendam, Quinn Steendam, Ilze Sandra Stults, Adam Trompen (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1-Motley Rice Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 2-The Miller Law Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 3-Robbins Geller Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit 4-Wexler Wallace Firm Resume, #6 Exhibit 5-Sommers Schwartz Firm Resume, #7 Exhibit 6-Napoli Shkolnik Firm Resume, #8 Exhibit 7-Weitz & Luxenberg Firm Resume, #9 Exhibit 8-Pitt McGehee Firm Resume); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION to appoint counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel by plaintiffs Susan Henry, Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman, Danielle Galloway, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Megan Johns, Michael Johns, Jeff Steendam, Quinn Steendam, Ilze Sandra Stults, Adam Trompen; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Douglas E. Wagner on behalf of defendant Wolverine World Wide Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Wagner, Douglas)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE rescheduling hearing: pre-motion conference rescheduled to 1/31/2020 at 10:00 AM (change in time only) at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER scheduling a pre-motion conference regarding document number (157 in 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 34 in 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 84 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB), (155 in 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 32 in 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 82 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB): pre-motion conference is set for 1/31/2020 at 01:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Wolverine World Wide Inc., Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (82 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB, 155 in 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 32 in 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB) ; filed by Therese Cooper, Heidi Hill, Mark Hill, Terry Van Wuffen, Ron Cooper, Michelle Van Wuffen, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Michael Johns, Megan Johns filed by Therese Cooper, Heidi Hill, Mark Hill, Terry Van Wuffen, Ron Cooper, Michelle Van Wuffen, Dennis Gregory, Malia Gregory, Michael Johns, Megan Johns ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant The 3M Company (84 in 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB, 157 in 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 34 in 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB) ; filed by Therese Cooper, Heidi Hill, Mark Hill, Dennis Gregory, Terry Van Wuffen, Ron Cooper, Malia Gregory, Michelle Van Wuffen, Michael Johns, Megan Johns filed by Therese Cooper, Heidi Hill, Mark Hill, Dennis Gregory, Terry Van Wuffen, Ron Cooper, Malia Gregory, Michelle Van Wuffen, Michael Johns, Megan Johns ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-SJB, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-SJB, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-SJB (Almonrode, Sharon)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting (159) motion for extension of time in case 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC; granting (36) motion for extension of time to file response/reply in case 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC; granting (86) motion for extension of time to file response/reply in case 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Sally J. Berens under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-093, Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody is no longer assigned to the case (ald)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint by defendants Wolverine World Wide Inc., Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Wolverine World Wide, Inc.; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC (Ramsey, Janet)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting (156) motion for extension of time in case 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC; granting (33) motion for extension of time in case 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC; granting (83) motion for extension of time in case 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant The 3M Company ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC (Ring, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to respond to the Amended Consolidated Complaint by defendant The 3M Company; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC (Ring, Daniel)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Wolverine World Wide Inc., Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Wolverine World Wide, Inc. ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC (Ramsey, Janet)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Consolidated Class Action AMENDED COMPLAINT with Individual Claims and Demand for Jury Trial against The 3M Company, Wolverine World Wide, Inc. filed by Malia Gregory, Mark Hill, Heidi Hill, Dennis Gregory, Therese Cooper, Terry Van Wuffen, Ron Cooper, Michelle Van Wuffen, Michael Johns, Megan Johns; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC (Almonrode, Sharon)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting STIPULATION (152) in case 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC; STIPULATION (29) in case 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC; STIPULATION (75) in case 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC; single amended consolidated complaint, if any, due 10/17/2019; answer(s) and/or renewed pre-motion conference request(s), if any, due 10/31/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend the Time to File Single Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by plaintiffs Ron Cooper, Therese Cooper, Michelle Van Wuffen, Terry Van Wuffen, Beverly Zimmerman ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-01062-JTN-ESC, 1:18-cv-01302-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00379-JTN-ESC (Almonrode, Sharon)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting STIPULATION #149 ; consolidating cases 1:17-cv-1062, 1:18-cv-1302 and 1:19-cv-379 for all purposes; striking amended complaint #150 ; setting deadlines for amended complaint and answer/pre-motion conference request; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 (STRICKEN) Consolidated Class Action AMENDED COMPLAINT with Individual Claims and Demand for Jury Trial against The 3M Company, Wolverine World Wide, Inc. filed by Beverly Zimmerman, Terry Van Wuffen, Therese Cooper, Michelle Van Wuffen, Ron Cooper (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 10/4/2019; stricken per #151 (mg).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Consolidate Cases by plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying #127 #129 #130 and #131 requests for pre-motion conference; Plaintiffs amended complaint, if any, due not later than October 2, 2019; Defendants answer and/or renewed pre-motion conference requests, if any, due not later than October 16, 2019; October 16, 2019 status conference is CANCELLED; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE - Waste Management Entities' Response to Order Setting Status Conference by defendants Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE Putative Class Plaintiffs' Supplemental Notice by plaintiff Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER setting status conference: status conference set for 10/16/2019 at 01:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; supplemental notice due not later than 9/16/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE re #143 Amended Joint Notice Regarding Case Management Pursuant to ECF No. 141 by plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE re #141 Joint Notice Regarding Case Management Pursuant to ECF No. 141 by plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by defendant Waste Management, Inc. (Wetwiska, Jim)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jim R. Wetwiska on behalf of defendant Waste Management of Michigan, Inc. (Wetwiska, Jim)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: joint notice due not later than 7/8/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 19-CA-44 reassigning case 1:19-cv-379 from Judge Maloney/Judge Kent to Judge Neff/Judge Carmody. ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (clw)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE adjourning without date 6/18/2019 pre-motion conference regarding document numbers #127 , #129 , #130 , #131 (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 JOINT NOTICE and Motion to Continue Consolidated Pre-Motion Conference by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Weirick, Stephanie) Modified text on 5/31/2019 (jlb).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James D. Herschlein on behalf of defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Herschlein, James)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephanie Bonnett Weirick on behalf of defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Weirick, Stephanie)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: cancelling 5/22/2019 pre-motion conference; scheduling a pre-motion conference regarding document numbers #127 , #129 , #130 , #131 for 6/18/2019 at 11:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint notice due not later than 5/30/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER scheduling a pre-motion conference regarding document numbers #127 , #129 , #130 , #131 : pre-motion conference is set for 5/22/2019 at 01:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. #127 ; filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (ems).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Waste Management of Michigan, Inc. #130 ; filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (ems).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Waste Management, Inc. #131 ; filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (ems).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant The 3M Company #129 ; filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza (Almonrode, Sharon) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (ems).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Waste Management, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Waste Management of Michigan, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant The 3M Company (Bulger, Richard) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (ems).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. re REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. #127 (Ramsey, Janet)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Ramsey, Janet) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (ems).
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion for Leave to Withdraw Dennis A. Lienhardt as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs by plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION to withdraw as attorney Dennis A. Linehardt as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs by plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman; (Almonrode, Sharon)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 OPINION AND ORDER denying #51 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; March 28, 2019 motion hearing is CANCELLED; Answers/responsive pleadings to plaintiffs' complaint or renewed pre-motion conference requests due not later than April 10, 2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lauren Gartland Northrop on behalf of plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Northrop, Lauren)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas M. Amon on behalf of defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Amon, Thomas)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman re Response to Motion, #122 (Almonrode, Sharon)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) #51 Supplemental filed by Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) #51 (3M Company's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Wolverine's Motion on Jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. section 1332(d)) filed by The 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts) (Bulger, Richard)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. re SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to supplement #51 Defendant Wolverine World Wides Brief Regarding Its Motion On Jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) #119 (Azzi, Robert)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF to #51 Defendant Wolverine World Wides Brief Regarding Its Motion On Jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Azzi, Robert) Modified text under the direction of Chambers on 3/20/2019 (jlb).
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William Kalas on behalf of plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Kalas, William)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER; Stay of Proceedings LIFTED; supplemental briefing schedule re #51 ; motion hearing set for 3/28/19 at 1:30 PM, before Hon. Janet T. Neff, 401 Federal Building, 110 Michigan St., NW, Grand Rapids, MI; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 RESPONSE TO #114 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant 3M's Notice Regarding Stay of Proceedings Pursuant to the Court's January 7, 2019 Order, ECF No. 114 filed by plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 19-CA-006 reassigning related case 1:18-cv-1225 to Judge Janet T. Neff and Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody for all further proceedings; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (ems)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE re #113 Advising the Court of Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by defendant The 3M Company (Ring, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER; Defendant 3M Company shall not later than January 14, 2019, file a notice; not later than January 28, 2019, the remaining parties (Plaintiffs and Co-Defendants) may each file a Response; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING TRANSFER from MDL Panel: regarding MDL No. 2873 (MIW 1:17-cv-1062) that the transfer of this action is denied. (kw)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #107 motion to stay; within seven (7) days after the Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Defendant 3M Company shall file a notice; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
November 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to stay All Proceedings until After a Decision by the JPML on Pending Motions for Transfer #107 Defendant Wolverine's Response In Opposition to Defendant 3M Co.'s Motion to Stay All Proceedings filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Azzi, Robert)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant The 3M Company re MOTION to stay All Proceedings until After a Decision by the JPML on Pending Motions for Transfer #107 , Brief in Support of a Motion #108 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence #109 (DeJong, Robert)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to stay All Proceedings until After a Decision by the JPML on Pending Motions for Transfer #107 filed by The 3M Company (DeJong, Robert)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 BRIEF in support of MOTION to stay All Proceedings until After a Decision by the JPML on Pending Motions for Transfer #107 filed by The 3M Company (DeJong, Robert)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to stay All Proceedings until After a Decision by the JPML on Pending Motions for Transfer by defendant The 3M Company; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Order) (DeJong, Robert)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Withdrawal of reply by attorney Daniel L. Ring re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of withdrawal regarding reply, #2 Attachment Proof of service re withdrawal, #3 Attachment Reply in support of motion to transfer, #4 Attachment Proof of service re Reply) (mg) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (kvt).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Notice of reply by attorney Jed W. Glickstein re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Reply in support of motion to transfer, #2 Attachment Proof of service re reply) (mg)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Mihir A. Desai re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Response in opposition) (mg)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Barnes F. Lovelace Jr. re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment List of parties) (mg)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Notice of Oral Argument by attorney Mark S. Cheffo re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re Oral Argument Notice, #2 Attachment Response to motion, #3 Attachment Proof of service re response) (mg)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of response by attorney Alan J. Knauf re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re response) (mg)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of response Memorandum by attorney Sharon S. Almonrode re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate re memorandum in response) (mg)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of response by attorney Nicholas Mino re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re response) (mg)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Response in opposition to motion for transfer by attorney Kristin Carter Rowe re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (mg)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Amended Appearance of attorney Michael L. Carpenter re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended certificte of service re appearance, #2 Attachment Schedule of Cases, #3 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement, #4 Attachment Amended Certificate of service re corporate disclosure, #5 Attachment Second schedule of cases) (mg)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Response in opposition to motion for transfer by attorney Kevin S. Hannon re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re response) (mg)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of response in opposition to motion for transfer by attorney David S. Jones re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re response) (mg) Modified text on 10/24/2018 (mg).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Response in opposition to motion for transfer by attorney Steven F. Casey re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re response) (mg)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Response in opposition to motion for transfer by attorney E. Britton Monroe re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re response) (mg)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Response in opposition to motion for transfer by attorney Seth A. Katz re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re response, #2 Attachment Notice re oral argument, #3 Attachment Proof of service re Notice) (mg)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Response in opposition to motion for transfer by attorney Matthew J. Douglas re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re response) (mg)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Proof of Service and Response to motion for transfer by attorney William G. Beck re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Response to Motion to Transfer by BFI Waste) (mg)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Response to motion for transfer by attorneys John W. Cerreta and Jonathan Handler re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (mg)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Response to motion for transfer by attorney Lloyd W. Gathings re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (mg)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Declaration in response to motion for transfer by attorney Thomas E. Stagg re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (mg)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney re Colin K. Kelly case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re appearance, #2 Attachment Proof of service re corporate disclosure, #3 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement) (mg)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney re Daniel A. Osborn case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (mg)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Michael L. Carpenter re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate re appearance, #2 Attachment Schedule of Cases, #3 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement, #4 Attachment Certificate of service re corporate disclosure, #5 Attachment Second schedule of cases) (mg)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Ellen Nunno Corbo re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 Schedule of actions) (mg)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Nicholas Mino re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Addendum to appearance, #2 Attachment Proof of service re Notice of Appearance) (mg)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney William G. Beck re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re appearance, #2 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement, #3 Attachment Proof of service re corp disclosure) (mg)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Amended Appearance of attorney Daniel L. Ring re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Addendum to appearance, #2 Attachment Proof of service re Notice of Appearance, #3 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement, #4 Attachment Addendum to Corporate disclosure, #5 Attachment Proof of service re Corporate disclosure) (mg)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney David Jones re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (mg)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Keith E. Smith re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re appearance, #2 Attachment Addendum to Notice of appearance, #3 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement, #4 Attachment Proof of Service) (mg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Elissa J. Preheim re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Appearance attachment, #2 Attachment Proof of service re Notice of Appearance, #3 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement, #4 Attachment corporate disclosure statement attachment, #5 Attachment Proof of service re Corporate disclosure) (mg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Daniel L. Ring re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Addendum to appearance, #2 Attachment Proof of service re Notice of Appearance, #3 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement, #4 Attachment Addendum to Corporate disclosure, #5 Attachment Proof of service re Corporate disclosure) (mg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Richard W. Head re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule of actions, #2 Attachment Proof of service re Notice of Appearance) (mg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Kevin S. Hannon re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re appearance) (mg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Mark S. Cheffo re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule of actions, #2 Attachment Proof of service re Notice of Appearance, #3 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement, #4 Attachment Schedule of actions (2), #5 Attachment Proof of service re Corporate disclosure) (mg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Lloyd W. Gathings re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (mg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Thomas E. Stagg re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Rider to Notice of Appearance, #2 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement, #3 Attachment Rider to Notice of Appearance (2), #4 Attachment Proof of service re Notice of Appearance) (mg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Kristin Carter Rowe re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement) (mg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Elliott Britton Monroe re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Corporate disclosure statement, #2 Attachment Proof of service re corporate disclosure, #3 Attachment Proof of service re appearance) (mg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Matthew J. Douglas re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service re appearance, #2 Corporate disclosure statement, #3 Proof of service re corp disclosure) (mg)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Jeffrey D. Talbert re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (mg)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Sharon S. Almonrode re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service) (mg)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Alan J. Knauf re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service) (mg)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE re #63 (service copy of Appearance of attorney Seth A. Katz re case Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of service) (mg)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE (service copy of Motion to Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (Attachments: #1 3M Company's Motion for Transfer of Actions and Joinder in the Tyco/Chemguard defefendants' motion for transfer, #2 3M Company's Memorandum in support of Motion for Transer of Actions, #3 Proof of Service re Motion, #4 Second Motion to Transfer and Joinder in the Tyco/Chemguard defefendants' motion for transfer, #5 3M Company's Memorandum in support of Second Motion for Transer of Actions, #6 Proof of Service re Second Motion) (mg) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (mg).
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE re #53 , #60 Limited Concurrence of Waste Management of Michigan, Inc. and Special Concurrence of Waste Management, Inc. by defendants Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY to response to motion #51 Wolverine's rsponse to 3M's opposing motion on jurisdiction under CAFA 28 U.S.C. Section 1332(d) filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Azzi, Robert) Modified text on 7/10/2018 (mg).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) #51 (filed per #59 ) filed by The 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (mg)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #56 motion for leave to file brief; the Clerk of Court shall accept for filing the proposed brief with exhibits (ECF No. 56-1); Defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.'s response, if any, due no later 7/9/2018; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file the Attached Proposed Brief #56 filed by The 3M Company (Clamage, Chad)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 BRIEF in support of UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file the Attached Proposed Brief #56 filed by The 3M Company (Clamage, Chad)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file the Attached Proposed Brief by defendant The 3M Company; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion) (Clamage, Chad)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. re Reply to Response to Motion #54 on Jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) (Azzi, Robert)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to response to motion #51 on Jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Azzi, Robert)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) #51 filed by Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Ryfiak v Wolverine World Wide, #2 Exhibit 2-Owens v 3M Company, #3 Exhibit 3-West Morgan v 3M Company, #4 Exhibit 4-Ayo v 3M Company, #5 Exhibit 5- Green v 3M Company, #6 Exhibit 6- Bates v 3M Company) (Almonrode, Sharon)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) #51 filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Moskal, James)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.; (Moskal, James)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman for Service of Response (Amended) Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant Wolverine's Motion on Jurisdiction Under CAFA 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) (Almonrode, Sharon)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman for Service of Response to Motion Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendant Wolverines Motion on Jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) (Almonrode, Sharon)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. for Def Wolverine's Motion on Jurisdiction Under CAFA, 28 U.S.C. 1332(d) and Brief in Support (Moskal, James)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held April 11, 2018 before Honorable Janet T. Neff; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 7/30/2018 ; redaction request due 5/22/2018 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Anderson, Kathy (616) 914-2384)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part #43 motion to modify 4/12/2018 order; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION to modify #42 April 12, 2018 Order #43 filed by The 3M Company, Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc. (Ferroli, John) Modified text on 4/25/2018 (cep).
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 BRIEF in support of UNOPPOSED MOTION to modify #42 April 12, 2018 Order #43 filed by The 3M Company, Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc. (Ferroli, John) Modified text on 4/25/2018 (cep).
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 UNOPPOSED MOTION to modify #42 April 12, 2018 Order by defendants The 3M Company, Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc.; (Ferroli, John) Modified text on 4/25/2018 (cep).
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Richard F. Bulger on behalf of defendant The 3M Company (Bulger, Richard)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Dorothy P. Antullis on behalf of plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Antullis, Dorothy)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark Jeffrey Dearman on behalf of plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Dearman, Mark)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER denying without prejudice #16 #19 #24 and #31 requests for pre-motion conference; briefing schedule re: Motion on Jurisdiction; answer(s)/responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint due fourteen days after this Court has resolved the Jurisdiction Motion; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Request for Pre-Motion Conference #42 sent via U.S. Mail to Richard F. Bulger (mg) Modified text on 4/17/2018 (mg).
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTES of status conference held before Judge Janet T. Neff (Court Reporter: Kathy Anderson) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jason Henry Alperstein on behalf of plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Alperstein, Jason)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert L. DeJong on behalf of defendant The 3M Company (DeJong, Robert)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stanley J. Stek on behalf of defendant The 3M Company (Stek, Stanley)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER setting status conference: status conference set for 4/11/2018 at 02:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. #16 ; filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza (Almonrode, Sharon)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Waste Management of Michigan, Inc. #24 ; filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza (Almonrode, Sharon)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Waste Management, Inc. #19 ; filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza (Almonrode, Sharon)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant The 3M Company #31 ; filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza (Almonrode, Sharon)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #17 , #20 , #25 , #30 motions for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #32 filed by The 3M Company (Clamage, Chad)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #32 filed by The 3M Company (Clamage, Chad)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant The 3M Company; (Clamage, Chad)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant The 3M Company by defendant The 3M Company; (Clamage, Chad)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Ramsey, Janet)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file Responsive Pleading #17 filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Ramsey, Janet)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Waste Management of Michigan, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 Complaint in Conjunction with its Pre-Motion Conference Request #25 filed by Waste Management of Michigan, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 Complaint in Conjunction with its Pre-Motion Conference Request #25 filed by Waste Management of Michigan, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 Complaint in Conjunction with its Pre-Motion Conference Request by defendant Waste Management of Michigan, Inc.; (Ferroli, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Waste Management of Michigan, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Waste Management, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 Complaint in Conjunction with its Pre-Motion Conference Request #20 filed by Waste Management, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 Complaint in Conjunction with its Pre-Motion Conference Request #20 filed by Waste Management, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 Complaint in Conjunction with its Pre-Motion Conference Request by defendant Waste Management, Inc.; (Ferroli, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Waste Management, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The 3M Company [Attorney Chad Matthew Clamage added to party The 3M Company(pty:dft)] (Clamage, Chad)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for extension of time to file Responsive Pleading by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.; (Moskal, James)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc.; (Moskal, James)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Diana Gjonaj on behalf of plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Gjonaj, Diana)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Paul F. Novak on behalf of plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Novak, Paul)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed; Waste Management, Inc. served on 12/11/2017, answer due 1/29/2018 (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jill M. Wheaton on behalf of defendants Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc. (Wheaton, Jill)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting STIPULATION #11 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting STIPULATION #10 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting STIPULATION #9 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for extension to respond to Complaint by defendants Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Moskal, James)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Madelaine C. Lane on behalf of defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Lane, Madelaine)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert Michael Azzi on behalf of defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Azzi, Robert)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark John Magyar on behalf of defendants Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc. (Magyar, Mark)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John A. Ferroli on behalf of defendants Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc. (Ferroli, John)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time by defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. [Attorney James Moskal added to party Wolverine World Wide, Inc.(pty:dft)] (Moskal, James)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Janet L. Ramsey on behalf of defendant Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Ramsey, Janet)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Wolverine World Wide, Inc. served on 12/7/2017, answer due 12/28/2017 (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Waste Management of Michigan, Inc. served on 12/7/2017, answer due 12/28/2017 (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; The 3M Company served on 12/8/2017, answer due 12/29/2017 (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants The 3M Company, Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc., Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (mg)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kevin F. O'Shea on behalf of plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman (O'Shea, Kevin)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Kevin Riggle, Shannon Colby, Debra Hilton, Samuel Colby, Rochelle Radlinski, Raymond Espinoza, Beverly Zimmerman, Rosalie Espinoza (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Samuel Colby, Shannon Colby, Raymond Espinoza, Rosalie Espinoza, Debra Hilton, Rochelle Radlinski, Kevin Riggle, Beverly Zimmerman in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4001458 (Almonrode, Sharon)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants The 3M Company, Waste Management of Michigan, Inc., Waste Management, Inc., Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (none provided) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper et al v. The 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Riggle
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Kevin F. O'Shea
Represented By: Lauren Gartland Northrop
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Dearman
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Colby
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Kevin F. O'Shea
Represented By: Lauren Gartland Northrop
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Dearman
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Zimmerman
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: Emily Hughes
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Kevin F. O'Shea
Represented By: Lauren Gartland Northrop
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Dearman
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: Thomas David Hoyle
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Colby
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Kevin F. O'Shea
Represented By: Lauren Gartland Northrop
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Dearman
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Radlinski
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Kevin F. O'Shea
Represented By: Lauren Gartland Northrop
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Dearman
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Espinoza
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Kevin F. O'Shea
Represented By: Lauren Gartland Northrop
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Dearman
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Espinoza
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Kevin F. O'Shea
Represented By: Lauren Gartland Northrop
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Dearman
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Hilton
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Kevin F. O'Shea
Represented By: Lauren Gartland Northrop
Represented By: Mark Jeffrey Dearman
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therese Cooper
Represented By: Christopher D. Kaye
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily Hughes
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Megan Anne Bonanni
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Robert W. Palmer
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: Thomas David Hoyle
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Gregory
Represented By: Christopher D. Kaye
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily Hughes
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Megan Anne Bonanni
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Robert W. Palmer
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: Thomas David Hoyle
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malia Gregory
Represented By: Christopher D. Kaye
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily Hughes
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Megan Anne Bonanni
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Robert W. Palmer
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: Thomas David Hoyle
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Groenendal
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalyn Ingham
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy James
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore James
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Johns
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Alana A. Karbal
Represented By: Christopher D. Kaye
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily Hughes
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Megan Anne Bonanni
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Robert W. Palmer
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: Thomas David Hoyle
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johns
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Alana A. Karbal
Represented By: Christopher D. Kaye
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily Hughes
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Megan Anne Bonanni
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Robert W. Palmer
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: Thomas David Hoyle
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Van Wuffen
Represented By: Christopher D. Kaye
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily Hughes
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Megan Anne Bonanni
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Robert W. Palmer
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: Thomas David Hoyle
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Van Wuffen
Represented By: Christopher D. Kaye
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Emily Hughes
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Megan Anne Bonanni
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Robert W. Palmer
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: Thomas David Hoyle
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Cooper
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: Thomas David Hoyle
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hill
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: Thomas David Hoyle
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Hill
Represented By: Dorothy P. Antullis
Represented By: Esther E. Berezofsky
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Sarah T. Hansel
Represented By: Thomas David Hoyle
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Jim R. Wetwiska
Represented By: John A. Ferroli
Represented By: Mark John Magyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Represented By: Michael A. Olsen
Represented By: Richard F. Bulger
Represented By: Chad Matthew Clamage
Represented By: Daniel L. Ring
Represented By: Joseph Callaghan
Represented By: Joshua Yount
Represented By: Robert L. DeJong
Represented By: Stanley J. Stek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolverine World Wide, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Wagner
Represented By: John V. Byl
Represented By: Suneeta Hazra
Represented By: James D. Herschlein
Represented By: James Moskal
Represented By: Janet L. Ramsey
Represented By: Madelaine C. Lane
Represented By: Michael D. Daneker
Represented By: Robert Michael Azzi
Represented By: Stephanie Bonnett Weirick
Represented By: Thomas M. Amon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management of Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Jim R. Wetwiska
Represented By: John A. Ferroli
Represented By: Mark John Magyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Co
Represented By: Michael A. Olsen
Represented By: Richard F. Bulger
Represented By: Chad Matthew Clamage
Represented By: Daniel L. Ring
Represented By: Joseph Callaghan
Represented By: Joshua Yount
Represented By: Robert L. DeJong
Represented By: Stanley J. Stek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Gerald E. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William J. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Charles E. Brickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Arthur C. Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?