Jomah v. Hazel

Petitioner: Fedrick Kabay Jomah
Respondent: Randy Hazel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00834
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas - Section 2241), #2 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Fedrick Kabay Jomah returned to the Court marked inmate released ;no action taken (clw)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by certified mail upon U.S. Attorney's Office on 9/4/2018 (clw) Modified text on 9/14/2018 (clw).
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by respondent Randy Hazel re Response to Habeas Petition #4 Brief in Opposition to Petition For A Writ of Habeas Corpus (Long, Jeanne)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 by Randy Hazel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Deportation Officer Jason Zywica) (Long, Jeanne) Modified text on 9/14/2018 (clw).
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by certified mail upon U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services District Director, Mirash Dedvukaj on 8/31/2018 (clw) Modified text on 9/5/2018 (clw).
September 4, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeanne Frances Long on behalf of respondent Randy Hazel (Long, Jeanne)
August 29, 2018 Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas - Section 2241) #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Fedrick Kabay Jomah (clw)
August 29, 2018 SERVICE by CERTIFIED MAIL pursuant to court order completed: copy of Petition with attachments #1 and Order #2 sent by certified mail, article number 70121010000141608583 and 70170190000045777449 to U.S. Attorney's Office and U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services District Director, Mirash Dedvukaj (clw)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and memorandum in support on the respondent by certified mail; respondent to answer the habeas petition within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
July 30, 2018 RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number GR061929 (jlg)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Fedrick Kabay Jomah (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jomah v. Hazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fedrick Kabay Jomah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Hazel
Represented By: Jeanne Frances Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?