Betancourt v. Boyne Mountain Resort, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rudolph Betancourt
Defendant: The Mountain Grand Lodge & Spa, L.L.C. and Boyne Mountain Resort, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00853
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Charlevoix
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12111
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sandra J. Densham on behalf of defendants Boyne Mountain Resort, LLC, The Mountain Grand Lodge & Spa, L.L.C. (Densham, Sandra)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part STIPULATION #6 ; deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to complaint extended to 10/1/2018; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time for defendant to answer or otherwise plead by plaintiff Rudolph Betancourt (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dunn, Owen) Modified text on 8/30/2018 (pjw).
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Boyne Mountain Resort, LLC served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018 (Fatica, Valerie)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; The Mountain Grand Lodge & Spa, L.L.C. served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018 (Fatica, Valerie)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Boyne Mountain Resort, LLC, The Mountain Grand Lodge & Spa, L.L.C. (ns)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
August 2, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Rudolph Betancourt in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4198879 (Dunn, Owen)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boyne Mountain Resort, LLC, The Mountain Grand Lodge & Spa, L.L.C. filed by Rudolph Betancourt (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Mountain Grand Lodge & Resort LLC, #3 Summons Boyne Mountain Resort) (Dunn, Owen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betancourt v. Boyne Mountain Resort, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph Betancourt
Represented By: Owen B. Dunn, Jr.
Represented By: Valerie J. Fatica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mountain Grand Lodge & Spa, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sandra J. Densham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyne Mountain Resort, LLC
Represented By: Charles H. Gano
Represented By: Sandra J. Densham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?