Bowlin v. Portland Church of the Nazarene Child Development Center

Plaintiff: Sandra Bowlin
Defendant: Portland Church of the Nazarene Child Development Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv00942
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
0 Judge: Ray Kent
1 Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12111
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Portland Church of the Nazarene Child Development Center served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018 (mg)
September 13, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Portland Church of the Nazarene Child Development Center and delivered to US Marshal for service (mg)
September 11, 2018 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Sandra Bowlin (mg)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
September 10, 2018 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Sandra Bowlin (mg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portland Church of the Nazarene Child Development Center filed by Sandra Bowlin (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 proposed summons) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowlin v. Portland Church of the Nazarene Child Development Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Bowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Church of the Nazarene Child Development Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?