Cascade Engineering, Inc. v. Tokio Marine America Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Cascade Engineering, Inc.
Defendant: Tokio Marine America Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00967
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: Michigan Western District Court
0 Judge: Ellen S Carmody
1 Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kenneth C. Newa on behalf of defendant Tokio Marine America Insurance Company (Newa, Kenneth)
October 23, 2018 12 MOTION for leave to file second amended and corrected answer to complaint re #9 , #8 with proposed document by defendant Tokio Marine America Insurance Company; (Christie, John) Modified text on 10/24/2018 (pjw).
October 19, 2018 11 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Defendant Tokio Marine America Ins Co (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Attorney Mark S. Allard) (Allard, Mark)
October 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John Joseph Rolecki on behalf of plaintiff Cascade Engineering, Inc. (Rolecki, John)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER striking amended answer #9 ; Defendant shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 5, 2018 9 (STRICKEN) AMENDED ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Tokio Marine America Insurance Company (Christie, John); this entry replaces #8 Modified text on 10/9/2018 per Order #10 (pjw)
October 5, 2018 8 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Tokio Marine America Insurance Company (Christie, John) Modified text on 10/9/2018 (pjw).
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 ; Defendant has up to and including 10/8/2018 within which to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 11, 2018 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to extend pleading deadline by defendant Tokio Marine America Insurance Company (Christie, John) Modified text on 9/11/2018 (pjw).
September 10, 2018 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for leave to extend pleading deadline by defendant Tokio Marine America Insurance Company (Christie, John) Modified text on 9/11/2018 (pjw).
September 6, 2018 4 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to Plaintiff Cascade Engineering, Inc. as well as the State Court by defendant Tokio Marine America Insurance Company (Christie, John) Modified text on 9/10/2018 (pjw).
August 30, 2018 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re notice of filing notice of removal (pjw)
August 29, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tokio Marine America Insurance Company (Christie, John)
August 28, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Tokio Marine America Insurance Company in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4220381 (Christie, John)
August 28, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Michigan Circuit Court case number 18-06630-CBB, along with state court summons, complaint and exhibits filed by Tokio Marine America Insurance Company (Christie, John) Modified text on 8/28/2018 (kw); Modified on 8/30/2018 (pjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cascade Engineering, Inc. v. Tokio Marine America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tokio Marine America Insurance Company
Represented By: John Raymond Christie
Represented By: Kenneth C. Newa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascade Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Allard
Represented By: John Joseph Rolecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?