Wolford et al v. South Shore Women's Health Care, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah F. Wolford and P.L.C.W.
Defendant: Lakeland Hospitals at Niles and St. Joseph, Inc., John Doe, Lakeland Healthcare, South Shore Women's Health Care, P.C., Lakeland Regional Health System, Lakeland Medical Center St. Joseph, John Bard and Mary Roe
3Rd Party Defendant: Intercare Community Health Network, Georgia Begnaud and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00975
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER accepting #12 motion for extension of time; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to serve an Affidavit of Meritorious Defense #12 filed by United States of America (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Extension of Time #12 filed by United States of America (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to serve an Affidavit of Meritorious Defense by third-party defendant United States of America; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 and #8 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
August 29, 2018 SERVICE EXECUTED (IMPLIED) on defendant Georgia Begnaud, Intercare Community Health Network (United States of America), through the filing of Notice of Removal; service upon defendant, Georgia Begnaud complete on 8/29/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Intercare Community Health Network complete on 8/29/2018, answer due 10/29/2018 (ns) Modified text on 8/30/2018 (ns).
August 29, 2018 MOTION to substitute party (as taken from #8 ) by third-party defendants Georgia Begnaud, Intercare Community Health Network; (ns)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by third-party defendants Georgia Begnaud, Intercare Community Health Network re Notice (Other) #8 , UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #4 , Certification Re Individual Defendants Acting on Behalf of the US #7 , Brief in Support of a Motion #5 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence #6 , Notice of Removal, #1 (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE re #7 of Substitution by third-party defendants Georgia Begnaud, Intercare Community Health Network (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Order Amending Caption) (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION deeming individual defendants to be acting in the scope of their employment or office on behalf of the United States by third-party defendants Georgia Begnaud, Intercare Community Health Network (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #4 filed by Georgia Begnaud, Intercare Community Health Network (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 BRIEF in support of UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #4 filed by Georgia Begnaud, Intercare Community Health Network (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by third-party defendants Georgia Begnaud, Intercare Community Health Network; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by third-party defendants Georgia Begnaud, Intercare Community Health Network re Notice of Filing Notice of Removal #2 (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to Berrien County Circuit Court by third-party defendants Georgia Begnaud, Intercare Community Health Network (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berrien County Circuit Court case number 17-286-NH filed by Georgia Begnaud, Intercare Community Health Network (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Lakeland's Third-Party Complaint) (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolford et al v. South Shore Women's Health Care, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Hospitals at Niles and St. Joseph, Inc.
Represented By: Carol D. Carlson
Represented By: Vanessa Fosse McCamant (CWNS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Healthcare
Represented By: Carol D. Carlson
Represented By: Vanessa Fosse McCamant (CWNS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Shore Women's Health Care, P.C.
Represented By: Carol D. Carlson
Represented By: Vanessa Fosse McCamant (CWNS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Regional Health System
Represented By: Carol D. Carlson
Represented By: Vanessa Fosse McCamant (CWNS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Medical Center St. Joseph
Represented By: Carol D. Carlson
Represented By: Vanessa Fosse McCamant (CWNS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bard
Represented By: Carol D. Carlson
Represented By: Vanessa Fosse McCamant (CWNS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Intercare Community Health Network
Represented By: Nicole Mazzocco (AUSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Georgia Begnaud
Represented By: Nicole Mazzocco (AUSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole Mazzocco (AUSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah F. Wolford
Represented By: William L. Benefiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.L.C.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?