Muskegon County Sheriff's Department v. Harbor Guard Boats, Inc.

Plaintiff: Muskegon County Sheriff's Department
Defendant: Harbor Guard Boats, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01074
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for default judgment as to Harbor Guard Boats, Inc. by plaintiff Muskegon County Sheriff's Department; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hughes, Douglas)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Harbor Guard Boats, Inc. (clw)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Muskegon County Sheriff's Department re APPLICATION for entry of default judgment as to Defendant #6 (Hughes, Douglas)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION for entry of default judgment as to Defendant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Hughes, Douglas)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Harbor Guard Boats, Inc. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018 (Hughes, Douglas)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Harbor Guard Boats, Inc. (clw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Hughes, Douglas)
September 17, 2018 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Harbor Guard Boats, Inc. (none provided) (clw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw)
September 14, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Muskegon County Sheriff's Department in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4236042 (Hughes, Douglas)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harbor Guard Boats, Inc. filed by Muskegon County Sheriff's Department (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Hughes, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muskegon County Sheriff's Department v. Harbor Guard Boats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muskegon County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Douglas M. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Guard Boats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?