Clements v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Douglas E. Clements
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC, Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC and Shermeta Law Group, PLLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01101
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Equifax Information Services, LLC only filed by plaintiff Douglas E. Clements (Reyna, Nicholas) Modified text on 11/16/2018 (ems).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER dismissing as moot STIPULATION #20 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Shermeta Law Group, PLLC (Hengeveld, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2018 Filing 20 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Amended for Second Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant Shermeta Law Group, PLLC (Hengeveld, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice STIPULATION #18 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 5, 2018 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Second Stipulation and Order for Second Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant Shermeta Law Group, PLLC (Hengeveld, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Fraser, Tamara) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (ems).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting STIPULATION #13 ; the time for Defendant Shermeta Law Group, PLLC to file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint is extended until 11/7/2018; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Trans Union LLC (Brady, Scott)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shermeta Law Group, PLLC (Hengeveld, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant Shermeta Law Group, PLLC (Hengeveld, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeffrey Steven Hengeveld on behalf of defendant Shermeta Law Group, PLLC (Hengeveld, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting STIPULATION #11 ; Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. has until 11/2/2018 to file its responsive pleadings; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Fraser, Tamara)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC (Brady, Scott)
October 2, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott E. Brady on behalf of defendant Trans Union LLC (Brady, Scott)
October 2, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrew M. Lehmann on behalf of defendant Trans Union LLC (Lehmann, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Fraser, Tamara) Modified text on 10/2/2018 (ems).
October 2, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Tamara Elizabeth Fraser on behalf of defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Fraser, Tamara)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Trans Union LLC served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Shermeta Law Group, PLLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mailing Receipt) (Reyna, Nicholas) Modified text on 9/27/2018 (ems).
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Shermeta Law Group, PLLC, Trans Union LLC (ems)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Reyna, Nicholas)
September 19, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Douglas E. Clements in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4240352 (Reyna, Nicholas)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Shermeta Law Group, PLLC, Trans Union LLC filed by Douglas E. Clements (Reyna, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clements v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Tamara Elizabeth Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Andrew M. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shermeta Law Group, PLLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Hengeveld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas E. Clements
Represented By: Nicholas Allan Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?