Varnum LLP v. United States Department of Labor

Plaintiff: Varnum LLP
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Intervenor: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01156
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO #15 United States Department of Labor's Pre-Motion Conference Request filed by intervenor Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co. (O'Reilly, Arthur)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference rescheduled to 1/9/2019 at 02:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 1/2/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER scheduling a pre-motion conference regarding document number #13 : pre-motion conference is set for 1/9/2019 at 02:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiff Varnum LLP for Summary Judgment Motion #13 ; filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co. (O'Reilly, Arthur)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiff Varnum LLP for Summary Judgment Motion #13 and Defendant United States Department of Labor's Pre-Motion Conference Request and Response to Plaintiff's Pre-Motion Conference Request; filed by United States Department of Labor (Almassian, Carolyn) Modified text on 11/29/2018 (ems).
November 26, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Rebecca D'Arcy O'Reilly on behalf of intervenor Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co. (O'Reilly, Rebecca)
November 21, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of C. Kevin Marshall on behalf of intervenor Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co. (Marshall, C.)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co. (O'Reilly, Arthur)
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiff Varnum LLP for Summary Judgment Motion (Phelps, Aaron)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 unopposed motion for intervention; Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company, shall no later than 11/27/2018, file an answer consistent with the proposed answer; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 20, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrew J. Clopton on behalf of intervenor Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co. (Clopton, Andrew)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION to intervene intervenor Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co. #9 filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co. (O'Reilly, Arthur)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 BRIEF in support of UNOPPOSED MOTION to intervene intervenor Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co. #9 filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co. (O'Reilly, Arthur)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION to intervene intervenor Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co. by intervenor Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (O'Reilly, Arthur)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 1/2/2019 at 11:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 12/26/2018; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses by United States Department of Labor (Almassian, Carolyn)
November 15, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Carolyn Ann Almassian on behalf of defendant United States Department of Labor (Almassian, Carolyn)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant United States Department of Labor, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ems)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Phelps, Aaron)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant United States Department of Labor ; please refer to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) regarding service on the United States and Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees (pjw)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Varnum LLP (Phelps, Aaron)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Phelps, Aaron)
October 11, 2018 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant United States Department of Labor (none provided; please refer to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) regarding service on the United States and Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees) (ems)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
October 9, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Varnum LLP in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4258616 (Phelps, Aaron)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Department of Labor filed by Varnum LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Phelps, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varnum LLP v. United States Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varnum LLP
Represented By: Aaron M. Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Rebecca D'Arcy O'Reilly
Represented By: Arthur T. O'Reilly
Represented By: Andrew J. Clopton
Represented By: C. Kevin Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?