Walters v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Walters
Defendant: Household Finance Corporation III, DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01190
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for defendants to respond to complaint; deadline extended to 1/11/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendants DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Williams, Dawn)
October 29, 2018 Copy of Stipulation and Order #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Brien W. Heckman (ns)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for defendants to respond to complaint; deadline extended to 12/3/2018; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 26, 2018 ATTORNEY Brien Winfield Heckman ADMITTED to practice in the Western District of Michigan (anm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendants DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Williams, Dawn)
October 23, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Laura C. Baucus on behalf of defendants DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Baucus, Laura)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Brien W. Heckman; attorney admission deadline set for 11/20/2018; (ns)
October 23, 2018 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Brien W. Heckman (ns)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. (Williams, Dawn)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Williams, Dawn)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to Clerk of Kalamazoo County Circuit Court and Attorneys of Record by defendants DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Williams, Dawn)
October 22, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4269366 (Williams, Dawn)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kalamazoo County Circuit Court case number 2018-0338-CZ filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Williams, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household Finance Corporation III
Represented By: Francis R. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn Nicole Williams
Represented By: Laura C. Baucus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn Nicole Williams
Represented By: Laura C. Baucus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Walters
Represented By: Brien W. Heckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?