Wise v. Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan

Plaintiff: Jeremy Wise and Jeremy B. Wise
Defendant: Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan and Midland Funding, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01213
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Midland Funding, LLC (Seitz, Theodore)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 2/19/2019 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 2/12/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 21, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Theodore W. Seitz on behalf of defendant Midland Funding, LLC (Seitz, Theodore)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting STIPULATION #9 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan (Hengeveld, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeffrey Steven Hengeveld on behalf of defendant Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan (Hengeveld, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to extend time for filing responsive pleading by defendant Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan [Attorney Jeffrey Steven Hengeveld added to party Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan(pty:dft)] (Hengeveld, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/19/2018 (pjw).
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018 (Nitzkin, Gary)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Midland Funding, LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/25/2018 (Nitzkin, Gary)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Midland Funding, LLC (pjw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Midland Funding, LLC filed by Jeremy B. Wise (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Nitzkin, Gary)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan (pjw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Nitzkin, Gary)
October 31, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jeremy B. Wise in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4278532 (Nitzkin, Gary)
October 30, 2018 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan (Fee Due) (pjw)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (pjw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan filed by Jeremy Wise (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Nitzkin, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wise v. Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co. of Michigan
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Hengeveld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Theodore W. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wise
Represented By: Gary D. Nitzkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy B. Wise
Represented By: Gary D. Nitzkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?