Doe v. Carson et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Ben Carson, Earl Poleski and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv01231
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO MOTION to amend/correct #1 MOTION to appoint counsel (with Certificate of Service) #11 , MOTION for order to retain anonymity (with Certificate of Service) #12 (with Certificate of Service) filed by Earl Poleski (Graney, Erik) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (ems).
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Ben Carson served on 12/3/2018, answer due 2/1/2019; United States of America served on 12/3/2018, answer due 2/1/2019 (ems)
December 12, 2018 Copy of Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order, #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Jane Doe (ems)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting granting STIPULATION #13 ; Defendant Poleski's response to the complaint is due 1/22/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 CORRECTED PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Respond by defendant Earl Poleski (Graney, Erik) Modified text on 12/12/2018; this entry replaces #9 (ems).
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE for summons and complaint served upon United States Attorney General (Washington, DC) by U.S. Marshal's Service via certified mail 12/3/18 (ems)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE for summons and complaint served upon defendant Earl Poleski by U.S. Marshal's Service via certified mail 11/28/18 (ems)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE to attorney Erik Alwyn Graney regarding recent filing #9 (ems)
December 10, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeanne Frances Long on behalf of defendants Ben Carson, United States of America (Long, Jeanne)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendant Earl Poleski (Graney, Erik)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for order to retain anonymity (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Jane Doe; (ems)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to amend/correct #1 , MOTION to appoint counsel (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Jane Doe; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Earl Poleski for Copy of ECF Notice of Attorney Appearance (Graney, Erik)
December 4, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Erik Alwyn Graney on behalf of defendant Earl Poleski (Graney, Erik)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 (titled as 'Amendment to Complaint') by plaintiff Jane Doe (ems)
November 14, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ben Carson, Earl Poleski, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (ems)
November 7, 2018 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Jane Doe (ems)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 6, 2018 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Jane Doe (ems)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
November 5, 2018 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Jane Doe (ems)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (ems)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ems)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ben Carson, Earl Poleski, United States of America filed by Jane Doe (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Carson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Carson
Represented By: Jeanne Frances Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Poleski
Represented By: Erik Alwyn Graney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jeanne Frances Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?