Bailey v. Midland Funding LLC
Plaintiff: Randy Bailey
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01243
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for defendant to respond to complaint; deadline extended to 1/7/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Midland Funding LLC (Seitz, Theodore)
December 10, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Theodore W. Seitz on behalf of defendant Midland Funding LLC (Seitz, Theodore)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Midland Funding LLC served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018 (Golden, Bert)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Midland Funding LLC (pjw)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (pjw)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Golden, Bert)
November 5, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Randy Bailey in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4283458 (Golden, Bert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Midland Funding LLC filed by Randy Bailey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Golden, Bert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Bailey
Represented By: Bert Thomas Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Theodore W. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?